Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carver Michael R., filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Americyan Loans, Balboa Luxury Condominiums Inc, Balboa Luxury Condominiums Inc., Best Loans, Does 1 Through 50, (total of 14) See All represented by Calin Sandra, Kramer Jeffrey Steven, Rosenthal Lisa Francine Esq., Rosenthal Lisa F, Calin Sandra Esq., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management390 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2014 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1741 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
VerdictPlaintiff |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc North West Dist. |
Case Cycle Time1757 days |
Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof of Service
Date: September 11, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 23, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FOR NOA
Date: June 29, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 20, 2016Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: November 07, 2016Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: December 08, 2016Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion-In Limine
Date: March 27, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion in Limine
Date: April 05, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion-In Limine
Date: September 08, 2017Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1
Date: September 08, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion-In Limine
Date: September 11, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion in Limine
Date: September 08, 2017Motion for Reconsideration
Date: September 21, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion
Date: December 04, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion
Date: February 05, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion in Limine
Date: April 16, 2018Opposition - Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Conduct Financial Discovery
Date: October 30, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 19, 2018Opposition - Opposition To Motion For Order Permitting Discovery Of Financial Information
Date: November 05, 2018Reply - Reply Brief-Motion For Order Permitting Discovery Of Financial Information
Date: November 16, 2018Other - - Motion For Order Permitting Discovery Of Financial Information
Date: December 07, 2018Declaration - Declaration Of Michael Carver In Support Of Motion For Order Permitting Discovery
Date: December 07, 2018Motion to Bifurcate
Date: January 18, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: February 20, 2019Other - - MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER BIFURCATING TRIAL
Date: March 07, 2019Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: September 03, 2019Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CORRECT MINUTE ORDER
Date: September 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CORRECT MINUTE ORDER RE JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF MOTION TO CORRECT MINUTE ORDER
Date: September 24, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: September 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT
Date: October 28, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDG. NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT
Date: October 30, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS BY DEFENDANT LUCINE MEGUERIAN
Date: October 30, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT
Date: November 12, 2019Other - - MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND ENTER DIFFERENT JUDGMENT
Date: November 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; HEARING ON MOTION FOR JU...)
Date: November 21, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: January 07, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 29, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: January 29, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: February 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE MEMORANDUM OF COST FILED BY ATTOR...)
Date: February 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: March 18, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: May 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF SCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: May 26, 2020Other - - OTHER - RULING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: July 09, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 10, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: December 28, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: February 16, 2021Complaint
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL PARK CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS )
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Order (RE TRANSFER TO IC COURT )
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED LOS ANGELES DISTRICT ATTORNEY )
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael R. Carver... )
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-21 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael R. Carver... )
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Notice (of order of transfer... )
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Howard Hinman... )
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-23 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-29 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-15 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion (& Motion for Reconsideration & Clarification of Ruling on Demurrer)
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Notice-Amended
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Motion-In Limine
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Motion-In Limine
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Memorandum-Other
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion To Conduct Financial Discovery)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Deposition Of Hrant Meguerian)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion For Order Permitting Discovery Of Financial Information)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Declaration ((Second) of Michael R. Carver In Support of Motion for Order Permitting Discovery)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Motion For Order Permitting Discovery Of Financial Information
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Reply (Brief-Motion For Order Permitting Discovery Of Financial Information)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (Of Michael Carver In Support Of Motion For Order Permitting Discovery)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Permitting Discovery of Financial Information)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other For Order Permitting Discovery Of F...))
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of No Opposition to Defendant Lucine Meguerian's Motion to Bifurcate Trial)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration Of Order Bifurcating Trial))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Motion For Reconsideration Of Order Bifurcating Trial
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Bifurcating Trial)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Request for Accommodations by Persons with Disabilities and Response])
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sandra Calin Regarding Motions In Limine)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Amendment To Notice To Appear At Trial And Produce Documents
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Brief (Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief of Defendant, Lucine Meguerian)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Objection (Defendant Hovik Meguerian Objection to Notice to Appear and Produce at Trial)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Lucine Meguerian's Partial Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Lucine Meguerian's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Rose Heffernan CSR#9820)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTY. FEES
Date: February 16, 2021Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: August 19, 2016Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 26, 2016Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Other - (-Proposed List CACI Jury Instructions)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-GIVEN)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-REFUSED)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-GIVEN)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-REFUSED/WITHDRAWN)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 08/20/2019)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Motion re: (Notice of Motion and Motion to Correct Minute Order)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Declaration (declaration of Ms. Droege Re: Judgment Notwithstanding Verdict)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Judgment ([PROPOSED] JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment Or Order)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Correct Minute Order re Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (declaration of Ms. Clark Re: Judgment Notwithstanding Verdict)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sandra Calin in Support of Motoni for An Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Correcting Minut...))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Reply (Reply Brief Motion to Correct Minute Order)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Response (Response to Court's Question Re: Unity of Interest)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA:06/29/20 B306459)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Appellate Order Extension of Time (NOA: 06/29/20 B306459)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Other - (Ruling on Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 31, 2020Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: January 12, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Notice (To Attorneys Re: Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Motion-In Limine
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Motion-In Limine
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Motion-In Limine
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Motion To Conduct Financial Discovery)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Deposition Of Hrant Meguerian)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion For Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice (Errata)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion For Attorney Fees And Costs by Defendant Lucine Meguerian)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for Judg. Notwithstanding The Verdict)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion for Ju...))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Reply (reply brief in support of motion for judgment notwithstanding the verdict)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Motion To Vacate Judgment And Enter Different Judgment
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Sur-Reply To Motion For Attorney's Fees And Costs By Defendant Lucine Meguerian
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion for Ju...))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/27/2019)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Judgment ([PROPOSED] AMENDED JUGMENT ON JURY VERDICT)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Judgment (Amended Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgement And Enter Different Jud...))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Memorandum of Cost Filed by Attorney Rosenthal)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Vacate Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Of Joint Answer By Defedants In Support Of Motion)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (opposition to motion to tax costs)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/30/2020)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Other - (Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment and Enter Difference Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Memorandum of Cost Filed by Attor...))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/19/2020)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Proposed Amended Judgment Filed by Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice (notice of continued hearing motion for attorney fees)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice ( of continued hearing on attorney fees)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs])
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/22/2020)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Notice (of scheduling hearing on motion to tax costs)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (FOR NOA)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees And Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:6/29/20)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion To Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion to Tax...))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/09/2020)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA: 06/29/20 B306459)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/10/2020)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.