Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Moses Sr., Kenneth, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Brayton, Alan Richard, against Alta Building Material Co., Ames Drywall Products Company, Cahill Construction Co., Inc., Century Indemnity Company,, Consolidated Insulation, Inc., (total of 21) See All represented by Biderman, David T., Blackard, Eugene Charles, Brydon, John R, Cordery, Theodore Thomas, Firestone, David Allen, (total of 16) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions663 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2094 days |
This complaint is a document filed by Century Indemnity Company, as the potential insurer of Defendant James A. Nelson Co., Inc., in a legal case in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Francisco. The complaint states that the...
ORDER SHORTENING ON MOTION (HEARING: 10/13/15 @ 9AM)
Date: October 06, 2015MINUTES FOR NOV-09-2015 9:00 AM
Date: November 09, 2015MINUTES FOR OCT-30-2015 3:00 PM
Date: October 30, 2015MINUTES FOR OCT-14-2015 11:00 AM
Date: October 14, 2015ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 14, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: September 07, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 56305633) FILED BY ATTORNEY MCCLAIN, FLORENCE A
Date: November 07, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 21, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54335855) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Date: October 04, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54333279) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.
Date: October 04, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54271656) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.
Date: September 23, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54204476) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.
Date: September 17, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54246065) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAHILL CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.
Date: September 20, 2013DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62996004)
Date: February 22, 2019RULINGS ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: November 09, 2015TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 58015318) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALTA BUILDING MATERIAL CO.
Date: October 14, 2015DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58581056) AS TO DEFENDANT RICH-TEX, INC.
Date: February 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE EACH PART TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 63273964) AS TO DEFENDANT JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. | |
April 04, 2019 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-04-2019. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 2/22/19. (503) | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62996004) | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS OF JUL-16-2018 AND SET FOR CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION ON APR-04-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. MATTER REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (503) | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION AS SUCCESSOR TO CCI INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUCCESSOR TO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA TH POTENTIAL INSURER OF DEFENDANT JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. A SUSPENDED CORPORATION ONLY, WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 62260474) | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 6, 1980 AS TO JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY. (TRANSACTION ID # 62260474) | |
July 16, 2018 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
October 19, 2017 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON OCT-19-2017. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 503 ON JUL-16-2018 AT 11:15 AM FOR TRIAL, CONDITIONAL UPON THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO CONCLUDE BY 11/17/17. ANDREW CHEW APPEARED FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS, APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL, SPANOS PRZETAK. DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL MAY REQUEST TO ADD THIS CASE TO THE 12/21/17 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IF THE CONDITION TO TRIAL BEING SET HAS NOT BEEN MET. LIV/OC (BRAYTON). JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: JANICE DISPO, CSR#13299 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580. (206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.