Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Educated Systems & Solutions Inc, Education Systems & Solutions Inc, Microcheck Solutions Inc, Microcheck Systems Inc, Smith, Mike, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Injunction case represented by Hubbard, Patrick G., Petersen, David Paul, against Campbell, Alex, Cms Technologies, Cms Technology, Educated Solutions Inc, Frost Bank Texas, (total of 15) See All represented by Perry, James Reid Ii, Petersen, David Paul, Stilwell, Richard T., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 125th with KYLE CARTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2001 |
CategoryInjunction |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House125th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Brief KNOX V. TAYLOR
Date:PROPOSED ORDER
Date:OPINION COURTS OF APPEAL
Date:PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: November 21, 2005CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM
Date: October 27, 2004LETTER REGARDING SEVEN WITNESS SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: November 02, 2004LETTER REGARDING ISSUED CITATIONS
Date: October 27, 2004EXHIBIT B- FULL AND FINAL SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE
Date: December 03, 2004MOTION TO WITHDRAW OF ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFFS
Date: January 19, 2005DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: December 04, 2004EXHIBIT A- RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: December 03, 2004PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: December 03, 2004DEFENDANT, MIKE SMITH’S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: January 31, 2005CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM
Date: January 05, 2005DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: December 03, 2004EXHIBIT C- LETTER REGARDING A SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: December 03, 2004LETTER REGARDING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE
Date: December 03, 2004PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: January 19, 2005EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENTER PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER
Date: January 31, 2005PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 30, 2005COPY OF ORDER SIGNED JULY 28, 2005
Date: June 27, 2005TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED
Date: September 08, 2005THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2005CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST
Date: July 11, 2005PROPOSED ORDER
Date: July 11, 2005LETTER REGARDING A RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: July 28, 2005VERIFICATION OF EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENTER PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER
Date: February 10, 2005DEFENDANT FROST NATIONAL BANK’S SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS AND ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: September 02, 2005ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD PARTY ACTION
Date: July 28, 2005PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 17, 2005MOTION TO DISQUALIFY ATTORNEY
Date: August 30, 2005PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 28, 2005AGREED MOTION FOR NON-SUIT OF FROST BANK
Date: October 28, 2005DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO JOHN MANNINGS CROSS-CLAIMS
Date: November 03, 2005JOHN D. MANNINGS MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 21, 2005Exhibit A - JANUARY 30, 2003 LETTER TO WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK FROM ROY MURPHY
Date: November 23, 2005DEFENDANT, SCOTT MURPHY, AND EDUCATED SOLUTIONS ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITIONER
Date: March 22, 2006DEFENDANT, MIKE SMITHS, FIRST AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION
Date: April 19, 2006PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: March 14, 2006DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: December 06, 2005DEFENDANT, SCOTT MURPHYS EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION
Date: April 19, 2006ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED
Date: December 06, 2005PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: July 18, 2006MOTION TO WITHDRAW OF ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFFS
Date: June 18, 2006ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 22, 2006PROPOSED ORDER
Date: July 28, 2006MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: August 08, 2006MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 04, 2006PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: July 20, 2006DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: August 11, 2006PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 08, 2006MOTION TO WITHDRAW OF ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFFS
Date: July 20, 2006ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: August 11, 2006TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: February 09, 2007TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: August 15, 2006DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: August 22, 2006PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PROTECT
Date: October 04, 2006PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 31, 2006CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM
Date: August 30, 2006PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 10, 2006DEFENDANT, MICHOICE TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 21, 2006PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 01, 2006PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 04, 2006PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 28, 2006DEFENDANT, MIKE SMITH’S, SECOND AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION
Date: December 01, 2006PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: October 31, 2006LETTER ENCLOSING PLAINTIFFS AGREED ORDER
Date: October 19, 2006DEFENDANT, SCOTT MURPHY’S FIRST AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION
Date: November 29, 2006PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DFENDANTS’ ORIGINAL ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM OF MIKE SMITH
Date: November 06, 2006PLAINTIFF/COUNTER DFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION OF SCOTT MURPHY
Date: November 10, 2006JOHN D. MANNINGS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION OF SCOTT MURPHY
Date: November 10, 2006RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: October 26, 2006ORDER GRANTING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SIGNED
Date: October 19, 2006THIRD PARTY DFENDANT JOHN D. MANNING’S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM OF MIKE SMITH
Date: January 08, 2007PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS’ FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM OF MIKE SMITH
Date: January 08, 2007DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2007ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: February 22, 2007PROPOSED ORDER FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2007PLAINTIFF’S THIRD AMENDED PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Date: February 01, 2007TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: February 06, 2007PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2007LETTER ENCLOSING DOCUMENT FOR FILING
Date: February 01, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 08, 2007PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: June 12, 2007LETTER ENCLOSING DOCUMENTS FOR FILING
Date: May 23, 2007TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: September 21, 2007MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: June 12, 2007THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT JOHN D. MANNING’S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM OF MIKE SMITH
Date: September 21, 2007TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: September 06, 2007PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: September 21, 2007PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: September 21, 2007DEFENDANT, SCOTT MURPHY’S FIRST AMENDED COUNTERPETITION
Date: June 15, 2007DEFENDANT, MIKE SMITHS, TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: June 15, 2007LETTER ENCLOSING DOCUMENTS FOR FILING
Date: September 21, 2007PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS’ SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM OF MIKE SMITH
Date: September 21, 2007PROPOSED ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: September 25, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 15, 2007LETTER REGARDING MEDIATION FOR THIS CASE
Date: September 11, 2007ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 20, 2007LETTER ENCLOSING DOCUMENTS FOR FILING
Date: September 25, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 12, 2007PROPOSED ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 02, 2007FIRST AMENDED TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: October 12, 2007DEFENDANT, SCOTT MURPHY’S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: October 18, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 29, 2007ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: October 31, 2007PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT’S SECOND AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 02, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 09, 2007ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: October 31, 2007DEFENDANT, MIKE SMITH’S THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: October 18, 2007EXHIBIT B- LETTER REGARDING NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE A SOLICITATION
Date: November 09, 2007ORDER DENYING MODIFICATION AND AMENDING TEMP ORDERS SIGNED
Date: October 30, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 09, 2007LETTER ENCLOSING DOCUMENT FOR FILING
Date: October 18, 2007TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: October 31, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 24, 2007ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: October 30, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 25, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 27, 2005UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: September 19, 2005UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: September 27, 2005PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 19, 2005MOTION FOR ENTRY UPON PROPERTY TO INSPECT
Date: October 17, 2005PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY UPON PROPERTY AND FOR INSPECTION
Date: October 12, 2005COUNTER PLAINTIFF, JOHN D. MANNINGS REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Date: October 14, 2005MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: November 03, 2005MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: November 14, 2005THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT’S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED THIRD PARTY ACTION OF MIKE SMITH
Date: November 21, 2007EXHIBIT C- LETTER REGARDING NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE A SOLICITATION
Date: November 26, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 26, 2007EXHIBIT A- DEFENDANT, SCOTT MURPFYS FIRST AMENDED ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2007EXHIBIT D- PLAINTIFF’S THIRD AMENDED PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Date: November 26, 2007EXHIBIT E- PLAINTIFF’S THIRD AMENDED PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Date: November 26, 2007EXHIBIT A- DEFENDANT, MIKE SMITH’S THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2007COUNTER DEFENDANTS’ ANSWER TO COMPULSORY COUNTERCLAIM OF MICHOICE TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.
Date: November 21, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 21, 2007EXHIBIT H- LETTER REGARDING BID PROTEST RESPONSE
Date: November 26, 2007EXHIBIT I- LETTER REGARDING BID PROTEST RESPONSE
Date: November 26, 2007EXHIBIT G- LETTER REGARDING BID PROTECT LETTER
Date: November 26, 2007PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 17, 2007DEFENDANT/COUNTER PLAINTIFF, MIKE SMITHS AMENDED TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: November 29, 2007RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MIKE SMITH’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: November 28, 2007OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT MIKE SMITH’S SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE
Date: December 03, 2007DEFENDANT, MIKE SMITH AND MICHOICE TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.’S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: November 26, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: December 03, 2007PROPOSED ORDER ON DEFENDANT MIKE SMITH’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: November 28, 2007DEFENDANT, MICHOICE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTION
Date: December 03, 2007PROPOSED ORDER FOR MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: December 11, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: December 17, 2007ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: December 11, 2007Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal
Date: February 11, 2009PLAINTIFFS’ SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: December 19, 2007DEFENDANT, SCOTT MURPHY’S SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: December 19, 2007DEFENDANT MIKE SMITH’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: December 17, 2007LETTER ENCLOSING DOCUMENTS FOR FILING
Date: December 31, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: December 19, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: December 31, 2007EXHIBIT D1-SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: January 17, 2008DEFENDANT, SCOTT MURPHY’S MOTION TO MODIFY INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2008ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 31, 2008EXHIBIT B-UNTITLED HANDWRITTEN AGREEMENT
Date: January 17, 2008ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION T0 DISMISS
Date: January 18, 2008PROPOSED ORDER - LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2008ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 30, 2008PLAINTIFFS’ SUPPLMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 11, 2008PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY
Date: March 12, 2008LETTER ENCLOSING CASES REFERENCED IN PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY
Date: March 13, 2008Letter - (Law Firm)
Date: January 02, 2009Law Firm (Letter)
Date: December 31, 2008TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: May 29, 2008TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: November 20, 2008Motion For Continuance
Date: January 02, 2009ORDER SIGNED DESIGNATING CASE TRIAL READY
Date: August 11, 2008Trial Preparation Order
Date: November 20, 2008Trial Preparation Order
Date: June 04, 2008Proposed Order
Date: January 02, 2009Law Firm (letter)
Date: January 02, 2009ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 06, 2009Defendant, Scott Murphy, And Educated Solutions' First Amended CounterPetition
Date: February 11, 2009Law Firm (Letter)
Date: February 11, 2009Letter - (Law Firm)
Date: February 06, 2009Letter - (Law Firm)
Date: February 10, 2009Trial Preparation Order
Date: December 09, 2011Notice/Referral To Mediation
Date: March 30, 2009Proposed order
Date: April 20, 2009ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: March 27, 2009Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Petition And Application For Injunctive Releif
Date: May 11, 2009Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Severance
Date: July 21, 2009Filing letter
Date: April 20, 2009DEFENDANT SCOTT MURPHYS STIPULATION AS TO EVIDENCE
Date: February 27, 2007EXHIBIT SAMPLES EXTERMINATORS, PETITIONER, V. LARRY SAMPLES, RESPONDENT
Date: February 27, 2007RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 28, 2007PROPOSED ORDER
Date: February 28, 2007DEFENDANT, MIKE SMITHS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: March 08, 2007TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: March 05, 2007ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: March 12, 2007AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: March 05, 2007ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: March 09, 2007LETTER ENCLOSING DOCUMENT FOR FILING
Date: March 02, 2007ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 20, 2007TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: June 15, 2007PLAINTIFFS’ AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: June 14, 2007EXHIBIT C- LETTER REGARDING NOTICE OF INTENTION
Date: November 09, 2007TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED
Date: July 21, 2009Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: February 11, 2009Plaintiffs' Motion for Severance
Date: July 13, 2009Proposed order
Date: July 13, 2009ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: February 25, 2009Plaintiffs Response to Defendants' Motion for no Evidence Summary Judgment
Date: May 11, 2009Letter - (Law Firm)
Date: March 04, 2009Proposed order
Date: May 11, 2009ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 26, 2009ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED
Date: February 20, 2009Filing Letter
Date: August 24, 2009Filing Letter
Date: July 24, 2009ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: September 09, 2009Filing Letter
Date: September 21, 2009SEVERANCE ORDER SIGNED, PARTY REMOVED
Date: September 22, 2009TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED
Date: September 18, 2009Agreed Motion For Continuance
Date: November 10, 2009Microchecks' Motion To Reconsider State Causes Of Action
Date: November 25, 2009ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: November 11, 2009ORDER SIGNED STRIKING PLEADING
Date: November 10, 2009Filing Letter
Date: November 06, 2009Proposed Order On Plaintiffs' Motion To Reconsider
Date: November 25, 2009ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: November 10, 2009Plaintiff's Motion To Reinstate After Dismissal Without Prejudice
Date: January 12, 2010Affidavit In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion To Reinstate After Dismissal Without Prejudice
Date: January 12, 2010Proposed Order Granting Motion To Reinstate After Dismissal Without Prejudice
Date: January 12, 2010Proposed Order
Date: January 12, 2010Defendant, Michoice Technology Systems, Inc. Response To Plaintiffs' Motion To Reinstate Case
Date: February 01, 2010Proposed Order
Date: February 01, 2010Affidavit In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion To Reinstate After Dismissal Without Prejudice
Date: February 02, 2010Proposed Order Granting Motion To Reinstate After Dismissal Without Prejudice
Date: February 02, 2010court of appeals first district (memorandum opinion)
Date: April 29, 2011DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: August 02, 2011Court of Appeals First District Correspondence
Date: March 15, 2010Notice of Appeal
Date: February 19, 2010Letter remitting payment for Supplemental Record
Date: February 10, 2011Letter from Court of Appeals First District Dated March 29, 2010
Date: April 14, 2010court of appeals first district (judgment)
Date: July 28, 2011Docket Control Order
Date: September 21, 2011court of appeals first district (Correspondence)
Date: May 05, 2010Letter from Law Office of Patrick G Hubbard Correspondence
Date: February 19, 2010TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 16, 2012AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED
Date: September 19, 2012Trial Preparation Order
Date: December 14, 2011ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: January 11, 2012Plaintiffs and Third Party Defendants Second Amended Motion in Limine
Date: April 13, 2012Proposed order
Date: April 13, 2012Defendant MiChoice 4th Amended Original Answer
Date: April 10, 2012Witness Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum
Date: April 13, 2012ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: April 20, 2012Order Resetting Trial
Date: April 27, 2012ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: April 17, 2012Proposed Order
Date: May 30, 2012Plaintiffs Motion To Reconsider State Causes
Date: May 30, 2012Defendant, Michoice Technology Systems, Inc. Fifth Amended Original Answer
Date: June 12, 2012Defendant, Mike Smiths Fifth Amended Original Answer
Date: June 12, 2012Motion to Authenticate Trial Exhibits
Date: June 13, 2012Motion for Continuance
Date: June 14, 2012DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: June 15, 2012Letter regarding filing of Mandamus
Date: June 18, 2012Court Of Appeals For The First District Of Texas At Houston Order
Date: June 27, 2012Motion to Quash
Date: July 23, 2012ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: July 19, 2012Proposed order
Date: July 24, 2012Proposed Order
Date: July 24, 2012Defendants' Motion to Compel
Date: July 24, 2012Order Resetting Trial
Date: July 25, 2012Proposed order
Date: July 25, 2012Response to Motion to Compel
Date: July 26, 2012Agreed Motion to Enter Judgment
Date: September 06, 2012Proposed Agreed Judgment
Date: September 06, 2012Court of appeals first district (memorandum opinion)
Date: August 29, 2012Rule 11 Agreement
Date: August 02, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice Of Activity | |
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Envelope Returned Undeliverable | |
September 19, 2012 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
September 19, 2012 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED | |
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Judgment | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion to Enter Judgment | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Judgment | |
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Court of appeals first district (memorandum opinion) | |
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Activity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.