Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ipwe, Inc, Spangenberg, Erich, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Baum, Michael L, Johansen, Mark L, Lavalle, Amy E, Nelson, Nick, Perry, Alec S, (total of 6) See All against Diamond, Wendy, Lucky Diamond Productions, Inc, represented by Clift, Gregory M, Lewis, Brandon V, Patton, Jonathan Robert, Tillotson, Jeffrey M, Tsai, Lisa S., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 20, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 20, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 22, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 18, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 20, 2020MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: September 16, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: September 16, 2020ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: October 06, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 22, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: July 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 01, 2021MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 25, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 13, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: April 27, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2021ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: April 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2020TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: July 18, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 29, 2021RESPONSE
Date: October 29, 2021ORDER - LEAVE
Date: October 12, 2021Motion - Leave
Date: October 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2021Motion - Continuance
Date: April 20, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 16, 2021COUNTER CLAIM
Date: August 18, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 18, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 22, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 21, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 14, 2021RULE 11
Date: November 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2021RESPONSE
Date: April 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2022NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 27, 2021MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: October 27, 2021ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: November 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 03, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 23, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 14, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 16, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: April 05, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 13, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: April 08, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 12, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 07, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: October 04, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 18, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 14, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: April 14, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 19, 2022ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: April 05, 2022MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: April 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2022MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: May 16, 2022REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: May 02, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: May 02, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 05, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 12, 2021RESPONSE
Date: November 05, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 24, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 06, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 30, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 30, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 30, 2022MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: March 31, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: April 05, 2022CHARGE OF COURT
Date: April 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 01, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: November 05, 2021MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: March 29, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: March 10, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: December 03, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 22, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 22, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: April 19, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 22, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: April 22, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 25, 2022STRIKE SHEET
Date: April 26, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: April 14, 2022RULE 11
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 22, 2022PRE-TRIAL HEARING
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER - LIMINE
Date: April 25, 2022STRIKE SHEET
Date: April 26, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 27, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 22, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 22, 2022REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: April 22, 2022Special Setting
Date: April 25, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: April 22, 2022ORDER - LIMINE
Date: April 25, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 28, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 28, 2022OBJECTION
Date: April 25, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 29, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 25, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 29, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: May 02, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2022CHARGE OF COURT
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: May 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3)-MARK JOHANSEN NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEF/MOTION ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT MOTION - ENTER ORDER MOTION ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEF/PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION BASED UPON PLTF/VIOLATION OF LIMINE ORDER REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS DEF/PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS BASED UPON PLTF/VIOLATION OF LIMINE ORDER |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEF/MOTION LIMIT & EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY MOTION - MISCELLANOUS MOTION LIMIT & EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANT MOTION APPLY DELAWARE & NEW YORK LAW NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY MOTION APPLY DELAWARE & NEW YORK LAW |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENY MOTION APPLY DELAWARE & NEW YORK LAW NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLTF/RESPONSE TO MOTION MISTRIAL RESPONSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.