Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rhodes, Vashone, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eldridge, V. Paige, against Exclusive Nationwide Delivery, Inc, Gomez, James, represented by Breeze, Johnny W, Holcomb, Rhonda D, Laird, Paul Craig, Lecrone, Adam B, Walters, Randall G, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 31, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: June 05, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 01, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 29, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 10, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 02, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2019DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 01, 2019CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: September 12, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 06, 2019MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: October 10, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 07, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 12, 2019Scheduling Conference
Date: October 22, 2019JURY DEMAND
Date: August 02, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 02, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 12, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 31, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 31, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 06, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 27, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 09, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 27, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 27, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 01, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 10, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 28, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: April 10, 2020ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 06, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 06, 2020DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: July 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 22, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 26, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 12, 2021RULE 11
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 19, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 11, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: September 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 11, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: September 23, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 09, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 25, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: September 18, 2020ORDER - STRIKE
Date: September 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 31, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: June 05, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 30, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: February 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 11, 2021RESPONSE
Date: February 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 04, 2021RULE 11
Date: March 05, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 07, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 09, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 13, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 11, 2021RESPONSE
Date: April 26, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 13, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: July 28, 2022ORDER - PARTIAL DISMISSAL
Date: February 24, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 22, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 06, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: May 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 27, 2022Motion - Strike
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: January 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 03, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: October 07, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 18, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 07, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 30, 2022RESPONSE
Date: September 19, 2022MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: September 21, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 27, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 16, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: January 26, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 30, 2023DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: March 29, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 27, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: September 27, 2022MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: August 19, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 27, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 01, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2022ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: September 30, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 24, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2023OBJECTION
Date: September 06, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2023ORDER - PARTIAL DISMISSAL
Date: April 24, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 08, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: September 07, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: October 14, 2021OBJECTION
Date: December 28, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: April 29, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: May 14, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 14, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 01, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 26, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: February 22, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 26, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: June 29, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 25, 2022OBJECTION
Date: September 08, 2023RESPONSE
Date: January 07, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: October 14, 2021MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: March 14, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 08, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 07, 2022SUGGESTION OF DEATH (OCA)
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2022DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: January 14, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 27, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: July 27, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: August 01, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 28, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 25, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: July 28, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 06, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 24, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 22, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 29, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 29, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: November 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 28, 2022RESPONSE
Date: September 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 29, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 30, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: January 26, 2023JURY NOTE
Date: September 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 05, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 30, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: September 12, 2023JURY NOTE
Date: September 13, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: September 12, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 11, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: September 14, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 03, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Notice Final Disposition Hearing TRIAL HELD 9-11 TO 9-14-23 |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | JURY NOTE | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER JUDGES RESPONSE TO JURORS REQUEST CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE JUDGES RESPONSE TO JUROR'S REQUEST |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER JUDGES RESPONSE TO JUROR NOTE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE JUDGES RESPONSE TO JUROR NOTES |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER JUROR'S REQUEST JURY NOTE |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - FRANCISCO S GOMEZ RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTF STRIKE SHEET STRIKE SHEET PLAINTIFFS |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS STRIKE SHEET STRIKE SHEET DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.