Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kevin Lynch As Administrator Of The Estate Of Rose Bouknight, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Sinel, Elliot B, against Glen Island Center For Nursing And Rehabilitation And, Jopal Bronx Llc D B A Workmen'S Circle Multicare Center, Montefiore Medical Center, represented by Atlas, Nicole Marie, Champey, Christine Anne, Fernandez Rockwell, Christine Eliza, Kolawole, Oluwatosin Gladys, Suarez, Gonzalo Gaston, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Lewis Jay Lubell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: November 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 25, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 25, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 03, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 24, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 10, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 16, 2021ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: August 24, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 10, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: March 24, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 05, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 09, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 26, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 31, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 26, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 17, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 16, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 16, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 15, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 18, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 17, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-1 Â (Motion #6) 1st Montefiore (Moses) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #6) North Central Bronx Hospital Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q-2 Â (Motion #6) Jacobi Record Excerpt 2 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q-6 Â (Motion #6) Jacobi Record Excerpt 6 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q-3 Â (Motion #6) Jacobi Record Excerpt 3 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q-7 Â (Motion #6) Jacobi Record Excerpt 7 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-3 Â (Motion #6) 3rd Montefiore (Weiler) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #6) *Corrected*
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q-1 Â (Motion #6) Jacobi Record Excerpt 1 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #6) Sutton Park Record Excerpt 1 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q-4 Â (Motion #6) Jacobi Record Excerpt 4 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #6) New Rochelle Record Excerpt Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q-8 Â (Motion #6) Jacobi Record Excerpt 8 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #6) Montefiore Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #6) St. Barnabas Record Excerpt Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q-5 Â (Motion #6) Jacobi Record Excerpt 5 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #6) Glen Island Record Excerpt Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #6) Sutton Park Record Excerpt 2 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 01, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 01, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 20, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #6) Exh. B - Co-Defendant Attorney Reply Affirmation & Decisions |
||
February 20, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #6) Montefiore's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts |
||
February 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #6) Montefiore's Attorney Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
February 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #6) Exh. A - Expert Reply Affirmation for Dr. Brenda Matti-Orozco |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Exhibit D - Photos - Noted in Defense Expert's Affirmation (Para 12) |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Exhibit C - Decision & Order in Ehrhart v. East Neck Nursing & Rehabilitation Center |
||
February 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5) Affidavit of Service of Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Exhibit B - Decision & Order in Schramn v. Garden Care Center Inc |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Exhibit A - Decision & Order in Stewart v. UPR Care Corp. |
||
February 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5) Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.