Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Yanping Xu, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Bill P Parkas, Bridgette Sedenfelder, Christopher Guercio, Errol D Toulon Jr, Mccoyd, Parkas & Ronan Llp, (total of 12) See All represented by Aghassi, Rachel, Craco, Paul V, Ellsworth, Andrew C, Garone, Alyssa Lynn, Shrewsberry, Lisa L, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Paul M Hensley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul M Hensley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Fraud Ejectment Disc.) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5-1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5-2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 13, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: June 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: June 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 10, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: March 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: March 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 10, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 30, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 23, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 05, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 05, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4-2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4-5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4-1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4-4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4-6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4-3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: April 25, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
July 10, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004) Reply Memo of Law in support of Motion to Dismiss |
||
July 05, 2023 |
APPENDIX (Motion #004) Jorden, 2014 US Dist LEXIS 1666 |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5-1 (Motion #004) Notice to Quit |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #004) Xu Email to MPR 1/6/2019 |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #004) Van Zwienen & Burger Accessed Decedent's Automobile 3/10/2019 |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5-2 (Motion #004) Parkas letter 9/7/2017 |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #004) Burger and Her White Friends Access to the Premise 1/6/2019 |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #004) Xu Email to MPR 1/3/2019 |
||
July 05, 2023 |
APPENDIX (Motion #004) Estate of Sydney 1994 NYLJ LEXIS 8506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.