Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Derek Robinson, Theresa Robinson, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Andrews-Santillo, Ashley, Paglinawan, James S, against Deepak Nanda M.D., Deepak Nanda, M.D., P.C., Emmanuel M. Pafos M.D., Long Island Jewish Medical Center, Northwell Health, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Benvenuto, Thomas J, Burke, Yanique Latoya, Graham, Ashley Renee, Kraus, Steven William, Sagesser, Regina Marie, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with PETER J. O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePETER J. O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management236 days |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: April 12, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 20, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 20, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 22, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 20, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 14, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 15, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 15, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 08, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 08, 2020ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: January 14, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 29, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 08, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 20, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 14, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 14, 2020ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: May 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 20, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 20, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 20, 2019ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: May 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2019NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 15, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 20, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 26, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 02, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 02, 2020STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 07, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: April 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Deepak Nanda, M.D.
Date: January 29, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Deepak Nanda, M.D., P.C.
Date: January 29, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003) BP to Pafos Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005) *Corrected*
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005) *Corrected*
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004) *Corrected*
Date: August 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 04, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 04, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 10, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 04, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: March 07, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 09, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT Â (Motion #009)
Date: June 14, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 24, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 02, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 03, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 14, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 14, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 25, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert disclosure-OB/GYN |
||
January 25, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 12, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND 3101(d) |
||
December 12, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND 3101(d) expert designation |
||
November 14, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Expert disclosure - Expert A |
||
November 03, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 03, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Northwell Health |
||
November 03, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) LIJMC |
||
June 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 14, 2022 |
ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #009) - Denied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.