Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Sang Cheol Woo, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Green, Marcus Johnson, Han, John, Stein, Darryl Glen, against Charles C. Spackman, represented by Abensohn, Adam Michael, Burstyn, Neal Frederick, Curran, Patrick Daniel, Spray, Judd R, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with O. Peter Sherwood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 23, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions414 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time476 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 26, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 24, 2019ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #005)
Date: February 26, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006)
Date: May 12, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: September 11, 2018ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: October 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #006)
Date: June 18, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: April 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 15, 2019ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2019DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT (Motion #003)
Date: October 10, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005)
Date: December 09, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: September 18, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: May 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #005)
Date: December 09, 2019ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #005)
Date: February 24, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #006)
Date: May 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #004)
Date: September 18, 2019NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #005)
Date: February 24, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 11, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: September 23, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: December 16, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: January 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: January 30, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 29, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: November 27, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 13, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: November 10, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001)
Date: September 06, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2017RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 23, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 23, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 23, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 23, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2017SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI
Date: May 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #006) IAS MOTION 49 2 P.M. OSC IN PART Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #006) Affirmation of Darryl Stein IFSO Contempt |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 19 (Motion #006) Spackman Group Profile of Charles |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 18 (Motion #006) December 19, 2016 Spackman Defense in Hong Kong Proceedings |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #006) TD Bank Checking Account Statements |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #006) Northern Trust Transaction Monitoring Report |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #006) June 18, 2020 Affidavit of Charles Spackman |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #006) Correspondence between Shook Lin & Bok and Wong Partnership regarding Funvest |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #006) Woo Affirmation |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #006) June 2, 2020 email from John C H Suen to Darryl Stein attaching Spackmans Disclosures |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.