Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
People Of The State Of New York, By Letitia James, Attorney General Of The State Of New York, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Auletta, Emily Lauren, Gowdey, Logan John, Gowdicott, Logan John, New York State - Office Of The Attorney General, Payne, Konrad Francis, (total of 6) See All against Abraham Operations Associates Llc Dba Beth Abraham Center For Rehabilitation And Nursing, Aharon Lantzitsky, Amir Abramchik, Aron Gittleson, Beth Rozenberg, (total of 25) See All represented by Cohen, Jason Todd, Graff, Ilan Tuviah, Henry, Robin A, Matetsky, Ira B, Menillo, Joanna Elizabeth, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Melissa Anne Crane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa Anne Crane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a petition for an order pursuant to the New York Public Health Law and New York Executive Law, among other statutes, 1) enjoining the respondents from operating the nursing homes in a manner that does not provide required care to residents an...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 11
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: June 28, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE *Corrected*
Date: June 28, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 28, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 28, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Weisz Tr. [04.27.2022]
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Weisz Tr. [03.31.2022]
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Smith Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Serebrowski Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Ramos Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Pompee Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Oliver Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Moore Tr. [07.21.2021]
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Moore Tr. [06.03.2021]
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Liff Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Lantzitsky Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Hendrix Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Kasperek Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Garritano Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Floyd Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Eusebio Tr. [05.20.2021]
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Arias Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Flanagan Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Eusebio Tr. [06.24.2021]
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Clark Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Afrifa Tr. [03.09.2021]
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Buddhavarapu Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Blackstein Tr.
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Afrifa Tr. [02.11.2021]
Date: June 28, 2023PETITION
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49S Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49S
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49R Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49R
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49P Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49O Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49L Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49N Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49M Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49K Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49K
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49J Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49J
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49I Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49I
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49H Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49H
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49G Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49C Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49C
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49E Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49E
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49B Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49B
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 48
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 47
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 46
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42G Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41C Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 41C
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41B Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 41B
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 41A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40B Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 40B
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 40A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 31A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 34
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 33
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 29
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 28
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 27
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 26
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 25
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 24
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 23
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 9
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 7
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 6
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 2
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 1
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 8
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 13
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 4
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 12
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 3
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49Y Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49Y
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - ZA Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49V Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49V
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49Z Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49X Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49X
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49U Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49T Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49T
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 54
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 53
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 52
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 51
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 39
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 38
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 37
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 22
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 21
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 18
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 20
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 19
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 14
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 17
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 15
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 10
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 53A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 41
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 43
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39C Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 39C
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39B Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 39B
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 39A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 31
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 30
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 16
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 103 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 103
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 102 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 102
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 101 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 100 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 99 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 99
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 98 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 97 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 96 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 96
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 95 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 95
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 94 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 94
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 93 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 93
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 90 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 90
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 92 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 92
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 91 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 91
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 88 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 88
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 89 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 89
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 86 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 86
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 87 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 87
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 85 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 85
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 84 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 84
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 82 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 82
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 83 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 83
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 81 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 81
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 80A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 80A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 80B Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 80B
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 79A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 79A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 79B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 164 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 164
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 161 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 163 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 163
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 162 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 160 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 159 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 158 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 157 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 156 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 155 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 154 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 153 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 152 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 151 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 150 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 149 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 148 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 147 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 144 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 146 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 145 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 143 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 142 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 141 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 140 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 139 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 138 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 137 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 136 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 135 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 135
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 134 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 133 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 132 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 131 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 129 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 128 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 125 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 127 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 126 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 124 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 123 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 122 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 119 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 121 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 121
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 120 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 118 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 116 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 117 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 115 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 115
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 114 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 113 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 112 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 111 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 110 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 106 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 108 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 107 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 105 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 102 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 101 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 101
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 93 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 99 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 96 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 95 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 91 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 90 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 5
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 58
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54I Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54H Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54G Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52D Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 52D
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52C Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 52C
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52B Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 52B
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 52A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50C Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 50C
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50B Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 50B
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49W Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49W
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 50A
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 192 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 189 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 191 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 190 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 190
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 188 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 188
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 187 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 187
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 186 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 185 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 185
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 184 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 183 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 182 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 181 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 180 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 179 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 176 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 178 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 177 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 175 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 174 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 173 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 168 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 172 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 165 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 171 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 167 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 170 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 169 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 166 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 26, 2023ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 18, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 18, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 11, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW (W/NYSCEF DOC. #'S) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 77 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 77
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 76 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 76
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 75 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 75
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 73
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 71
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 72 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 72
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70B Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 70B
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70A Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 70A
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 68
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 67
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 65
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 63
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 64
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 61
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 62
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 59
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 57
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 56
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 55
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 87 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 85 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 86 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 84 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 80 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 80
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 77 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 74
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 70
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 69
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 66
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 49
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 60
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 58
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 35
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 45
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #001) Exhibit 32
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 07, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 09, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: February 20, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 09, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 02, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 02, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 02, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 12, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 12, 2024STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 09, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 11, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 09, 2024SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 05, 2024ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 05, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 05, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: November 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 10, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 10, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: August 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 03, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED) Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 01, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 01, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 29, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 15, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 31, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 01, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 15, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 15, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 01, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 01, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 15, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 08, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 01, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 15, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 15, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 15, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 15, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Respondents Letter to Justice Crane Regarding Hasan |
||
April 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Hasan v. Terrace Acquisitions II |
||
April 01, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A |
||
April 01, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 01, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 01, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B |
||
March 29, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 29, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 20, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A March 15, 2024 Cold Spring Decision |
||
March 20, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.