Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Coree Spencer, Individually And On Behalf Of Others Similarly Situated, Pamela Graham, Vincent Settecasi, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brown, Jeffrey Kevin, Cohen, Brett R., Leeds, Suzanne Brooke, Tompkins, Michael Alexander, against Bruce A. Kurtz, Core Ziegfeld, Llc D B A Ziegfeld Balroom, Gotham Hall, Llc, Gotham Hall Operating Entity, Llc, Simon Auerbacher, (total of 5) See All represented by Bluth, Valerie J, Calamia, Jennifer, Fugazy, Amanda M., Rooney, Paul Patrick, Sanon, Stephania Cabrini, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with PERRY, W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERRY, W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a complaint filed in a class action on behalf of persons who performed work as service employees for Defendants in Defendants' catering business. The action seeks to recover unlawfully retained gratuities and overtime compensation owed to Pla...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 30, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE -FROM COURT
Date: September 07, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: March 09, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 25, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 09, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: November 20, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 12, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 11, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 24, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 12, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 12, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 30, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 13, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: June 10, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 25, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 08, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 10, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 11, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 14, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 13, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 20, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 10, 2018RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 20, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 20, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 03, 2018ANSWER
Date: June 06, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 14, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 14, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 14, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 14, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 13, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 26, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 13, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) | ||
February 29, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | ||
November 28, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) Duplicate of Ex. B sans Exhibit Cover Page |
||
October 23, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) | ||
October 20, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) | ||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Claim Form |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Curriculum Vitae of CPT Group, Inc. |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Resume of Mediator Scheinman |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Notice of Settlement of Class Action Lawsuit |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Proposed Approval Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.