Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Robin Ellis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jaffe, Richard S., against Michael E. Oswald, The Village Of Rockville Centre, represented by Croutier, William J, Hasan, Syed T, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Lisa A Cairo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa A Cairo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 24, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 18, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 20, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 27, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 27, 2023MARKED PLEADINGS
Date: June 27, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 29, 2024NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 14, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 15, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
January 24, 2024 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
January 24, 2024 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
January 12, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Judge Withdrawing SJ Motion |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) OSWALD AFFIDAVIT |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) 50h TRANSCRIPT |
||
December 28, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
December 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT |
||
December 28, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.