Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Antonio Espinosa, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Labell, Steven J., Oresky, Jacob, against Mac 60 Llc, Royal Home Improvements, Inc., represented by Gibbons, Christopher Mark, Ritzert, Gail L, Sulieman, Afaf S., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Carolyn E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: September 27, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2019ANSWER
Date: December 06, 2018STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 06, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 20, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 29, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 06, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 18, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 07, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 11, 2019ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 24, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Corrected*
Date: March 18, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: April 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 30, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 30, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 13, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 06, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: November 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2019THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: October 29, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 23, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 06, 2018AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: January 27, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 22, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 06, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 09, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 14, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: November 03, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 14, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 25, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 14, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 30, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 05, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 05, 2023ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) | ||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Email Chain |
||
June 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Subpoena and AOS - Alpha 3T MRI |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Bill of Particulars |
||
June 06, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5) Defs. MAC 60 LLC & Royal Home Affirmation in Reply & In Further Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion Defs. MAC 60 LLC & Royal Home Affirmation in Reply & In Further Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion ... show more |
||
May 09, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
May 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of service |
||
April 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #3) TPD Gilmar EBT Transcript Marat Gilmanov 3-7-2022 (Motion Seq. #3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.