Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michele Sardo Individually, Michele Sardo Individually, N. J. S. An Infant, By And Through Her Parent And Natural Guardian, Michele Sardo, And, N. J. S. An Infant, By And Through Her Parent And Natural Guardian, Michele Sardo, And, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Hall, Richard Alison, Nicastro, Joseph Lucian, against West Seneca Central School District, West Seneca Central School District Board Of Education, West Senior High School, represented by Dingeldey, Louis Brian, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Dennis Ward presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis Ward Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligent Supervision) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 19, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 04, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 04, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 04, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: March 26, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 22, 2023ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: March 24, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005) Matthew Bystrak EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005) John Brinker EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005) Chrystler Stortz EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005) West Seneca Police Dept Incident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005) Certificates of Conviction Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005) N.J.S. 50-H Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005) Incident Description-D.A.R. Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005) Incident Description-G.A.M. Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 26, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 07, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 07, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: August 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: November 14, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 21, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 21, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #005) Matthew Bystrak EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Matthew Bystrak EBT Transcript Redacted |
||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #005) John Brinker EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR John Brinker EBT Transcript Redacted |
||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) Chrystler Stortz EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Chrystler Stortz EBT Transcript Redacted |
||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #005) West Seneca Police Dept Incident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR West Seneca Police Dept Incident Report Redacted |
||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Certificates of Conviction Redacted per 22 NYCRR Certificates of Conviction Redacted |
||
November 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #005) New Article |
||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #005) N.J.S. 50-H Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR N.J.S. 50-H Transcript Redacted |
||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #005) Plaintiffs' VBOP & Supplemental VBOP |
||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #005) West Seneca Central School District Code of Conduct |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.