Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deborah V Grey, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case against Mary T Bassett Md Mpn The Commissioner, New York State Department Of Health, represented by Rodriguez, Gregory John, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with Gerald Connolly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald Connolly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
PETITION
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D K Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N O Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S T Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 31, 2022ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 02, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 02, 2022 |
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Amended Order |
||
November 02, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Respondent's Atty suggested I write this letter |
||
October 31, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 17, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 17, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
||
October 17, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F1 (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
September 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D K (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
September 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.