Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Best Help Homecare, Inc., Careaide Direct Inc., Carefirst Cdpap, Corp, Easy Choice Agency Inc., Harbor Care Llc, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Adams , Derek Michael, against Mary T. Bassett, Md, Mph, New York State Department Of Health, represented by Hamilton, Stacey Ann, Rock, Robert J., in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with Gerald Connolly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald Connolly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 05, 2022PETITION
Date: July 05, 2022APPENDIX
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 05, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: July 07, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION
Date: August 19, 2022STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: August 05, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 19, 2022STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: August 09, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: August 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 31, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: August 30, 2022ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: August 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: August 31, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 23, 2022APPENDIX
Date: November 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 12, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 12, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
January 09, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
December 28, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
December 28, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 28, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 25, 2022 | APPENDIX | ||
November 25, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 23, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT NOTE: CONFERENCE ON 11/28/22 AT 3 P.M. |
||
November 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.