Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pennrose Llc, filed a(n) Mt. Laurel case represented by Richard J Perr, against Andre Oliveriera, Annette L Smith, Aparecida S Coutinho, Apc Associates Llc, Carl Muller, (total of 64) See All represented by Anthony P Costa, Douglas Lynn Heinold, Mark G Carusillo, in the jurisdiction of Burlington County, NJ, . Burlington County, NJ Superior Courts with Paula T Dow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula T Dow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 30, 2018 |
CategoryMt. Laurel |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBurlington County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DOUGLAS LYNN HEINOLD
Date: May 30, 2018TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 05, 2018Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JEFFREY I BARON
Date: May 30, 2018Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by SIGMUND TONIA
Date: May 30, 2018Order To Vacate Order - GRANTED by Judge BOOKBINDER, RONALD, E
Date: November 05, 2018LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 05, 2019Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by MARK G CARUSILLO
Date: May 30, 2018Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by SCOTT G KERN
Date: May 30, 2018General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARYL F TONIA
Date: August 31, 2018Motion To Bar submitted by Staff
Date: August 13, 2019General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH
Date: October 21, 2019Request For Default uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by MERYL A GONCHAR
Date: April 17, 2019Correspondence submitted by Staff
Date: December 16, 2019Order To Refer To Mediator Without Stay - by Judge HARRINGTON, JOHN, E
Date: October 15, 2018Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T
Date: July 19, 2019Order For Summary Judgment - DENIED by Judge BOOKBINDER, RONALD, E
Date: June 28, 2019General Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: June 11, 2019General Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: June 10, 2019Order For Summary Judgment - DENIED by Judge BOOKBINDER, RONALD, E
Date: April 12, 2019Letter Memorandum uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH
Date: December 11, 2019General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RICHARD J PERR
Date: October 29, 2019ORDER TO BAR-Denied by Judge DOW, PAULA, T re: MOTION TO BAR [LCV20191467273]
Date: August 30, 2019General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH
Date: December 09, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - GRANTED by Judge Paula T. Dow, P.J.Ch.
Date: December 09, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - GRANTED by Judge Paula T. Dow, P.J.Ch.
Date: September 24, 2019General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH
Date: November 04, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - GRANTED by Judge Paula T. Dow, P.J.Ch.
Date: November 04, 2019Order Extending Time For Filing Of Document - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T
Date: September 10, 2019Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: September 09, 2019General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH
Date: September 04, 2019Reply Brief uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH
Date: August 27, 2019General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH
Date: September 13, 2019General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH
Date: August 27, 2019Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge DOW, PAULA, T
Date: July 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2020 |
TRIAL
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
April 20, 2020 |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
January 03, 2020 |
STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
||
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by HEINOLD, DOUGLAS, LYNN of RAYMOND COLEMAN HEINOLD LLP on behalf of JOHN S RADOMSKI, JOSEPH CAVALIERI, SCOTT G KERN, MARIE E KERN, CAROL L RADOMSKI against PENNROSE LLC | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Correspondence submitted by Staff | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Memorandum uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by RUSSELL SMITH | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - GRANTED by Judge Paula T. Dow, P.J.Ch. | |
December 09, 2019 |
STATUS CONFERENCE
Judge: PAULA T DOW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.