Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Filed By: Robinson, Jay, On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, Pineda, Hugo, Robinson, Jay, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Patricia A Savage, against Asomeo Environmental Restoration Industry, Llc, A California Corporation, Does 1-10, Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services, Llc, A North Carolina Corporation, Phillips & Jordan Inc, Phillips & Jordan Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Morgan P Forsey, Shane Singh, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2019 |
Category(Other Employment Complaint Case) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This is a complaint filed on behalf of plaintiffs and similarly situated individuals, alleging causes of action for failure to pay minimum wages, overtime, and final wages; inaccurate wage statements; failure to pay all wages upon termination; failur...
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: August 29, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 12, 2023Tentative Case Management Order
Date: February 08, 2024Joint Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2024Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 09, 2024Joint Case Management Statement
Date: February 22, 2024Stipulated Protective Order
Date: March 06, 2024Objection To evidence ISO Opposition to Plantiffs Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 11, 2024Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Class Certification)
Date: March 22, 2024Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 11, 2024Tentative Ruling (Motion for Class Certification)
Date: March 21, 2024Complaint
Date: August 16, 2019Summons
Date: August 16, 2019Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 21, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 16, 2019Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: August 19, 2019Tentative Case Management Order
Date: April 27, 2023Tentative Ruling
Date: April 17, 2023Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO MSJ/SA
Date: June 14, 2023Opposition to Motion for Class Certification
Date: June 13, 2023Declaration of Grace Mehta ISO Opposition to Motion for Class Certification
Date: June 13, 2023Other - Appendix of Evidence ISO MSA
Date: June 14, 2023Tentative Ruling (Motion for Class Certification - Civil Law and Motion)
Date: June 26, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: June 14, 2023Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO MSJ
Date: June 14, 2023Proof of Service by Email
Date: June 14, 2023Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 13, 2023Proposed Order Granting MSJ/SA
Date: June 14, 2023Proof of Service Electronic Mail
Date: June 26, 2023Notice of Department Relocation
Date: January 05, 2024Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: January 12, 2024Minute Order (Case Management Conference Complex Case Mgmt Conference)
Date: December 07, 2023Tentative Case Management Order
Date: December 06, 2023Notice of Hearing On Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: January 22, 2024Tentative Case Management Order
Date: March 07, 2024Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 08, 2024Case Management Statement
Date: February 05, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: February 07, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 20, 2020Attorneys Compliance Statement
Date: March 11, 2020Attorneys Compliance Statement
Date: March 13, 2020Notice
Date: May 12, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: March 18, 2020Answer To Second Amended Complaint
Date: September 10, 2020Opposition to Motion to Compel Special/Form Interrogatories
Date: September 10, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 05, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 05, 2020Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification
Date: June 26, 2023Notice of Rejection - General
Date: August 15, 2023Declaration of Lawrence J Kahn in Support of Motion
Date: November 06, 2019Response to Opp to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories
Date: October 29, 2020Minute Order (Motion for Class Certification - Civil Law and Motion)
Date: June 27, 2023Notice of Case Mgmt Confrnc and Orders
Date: June 29, 2023Response to Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Opposition to MSJ/SA
Date: August 15, 2023Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: August 15, 2023Tentative Ruling (Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: August 28, 2023Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 12, 2019Motion for Change of Venue
Date: November 06, 2019Notice and Order of Complex Determination
Date: September 12, 2019Reply to Motion to Transfer
Date: December 03, 2019Notice
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration of Shane Singh in Support of Motion
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration of Patricia Savage in Support of Opposition
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 06, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion
Date: November 06, 2019Opposition to Motion
Date: November 25, 2019Objection to Declaration
Date: December 03, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 10, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: December 09, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 20, 2020Amended Complaint First
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 03, 2019Joint Case Management Statement
Date: May 15, 2020Declaration of Shane Singh ISO Opp to Motion to Compel
Date: September 10, 2020Order Granting Leave to Amend
Date: June 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 11, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: May 13, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: May 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: August 16, 2021Attorneys Compliance Statement
Date: May 13, 2020Notice
Date: August 26, 2020Notice
Date: August 19, 2020Opposition to Motion to Compel Request for Admission
Date: September 10, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 10, 2020Motion to Compel Further Responses to plfs Request for Production Set One
Date: September 10, 2020Opposition to Motion to Compel Request for Production
Date: September 10, 2020Statement ISO Motion to Compel Further Responses to plfs Request for Production Set One
Date: September 10, 2020Motion to Compel Further Responses to plfs Request for Admissions Set One
Date: September 10, 2020Response to defs Opp to plfs Motion to Compel
Date: September 18, 2020Amended Complaint Second
Date: September 18, 2020Separate Statement ISO Motion to Compel Further Responses to plfs Request for Admissions Set One
Date: September 10, 2020Declaration of Patricia A Savage ISO plfs Response to defs Opp to plfs Motion to Compel
Date: September 18, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 23, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 16, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 17, 2023Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: December 03, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: September 28, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 13, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: June 30, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 13, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: June 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 27, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 30, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 23, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: April 28, 2023Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2022Motion for Class Certification
Date: April 11, 2023Stipulated Protective Order
Date: February 15, 2024Minute Order (Motion for Class Certification - Civil Law and Motion)
Date: June 27, 2023Case Management Statement Filed by: Jay Robinson (Plaintiff)
Date: April 17, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 14, 2023Tentative Case Management Order
Date: April 26, 2023Opposition (to Motion to Compel Request for Production) filed.
Date: September 10, 2020Declaration - Other (of Shane Singh in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: November 06, 2019Opposition (to Motion) filed.
Date: November 25, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: August 16, 2019Motion to Certify Class filed.
Date: April 11, 2023Response (to defs Opp to plfs Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: September 18, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 30, 2022Declaration - Other (of Patricia Savage in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: November 25, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: November 06, 2019Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 15, 2020Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: March 13, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Errata filed.
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration - Other (of Lawrence J Kahn in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: November 06, 2019Response (to Opp to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: October 29, 2020Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: March 11, 2020Order - Other (Granting Leave to Amend) filed.
Date: June 05, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.
Date: December 03, 2021Objection (to Declaration) filed.
Date: December 03, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: October 22, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 13, 2020Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to plfs Request for Production Set One) filed.
Date: September 10, 2020Opposition (to Motion to Compel Special/Form Interrogatories) filed.
Date: September 10, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 28, 2022Summons filed.
Date: August 16, 2019Minutes finalized for heard on 08/16/2021 09:00:00 AM .
Date: August 16, 2021Case Management Statement filed.
Date: February 05, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: August 16, 2019Motion for Change of Venue filed.
Date: November 06, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 27, 2022Opposition (to Motion to Compel Request for Admission) filed.
Date: September 10, 2020Proof of Service filed.
Date: December 03, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: September 13, 2021Amended Complaint (Second) filed.
Date: September 18, 2020Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: May 13, 2020Amended Complaint (First) filed.
Date: January 24, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: March 11, 2020Declaration - Other (of Shane Singh ISO Opp to Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: September 10, 2020Motion - Other submitted by Robinson, Jay; Pineda, Hugo rejected on 08/26/2020 .
Date: August 26, 2020Proof of Service filed.
Date: September 10, 2020Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Transfer) filed.
Date: December 03, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: April 13, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: November 05, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 20, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: August 16, 2021Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other filed.
Date: May 22, 2020Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: November 06, 2019Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: September 12, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 23, 2022Answer (To Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: September 10, 2020Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to plfs Request for Admissions Set One) filed.
Date: September 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2024 |
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Class Certification) Document |
||
March 21, 2024 |
Tentative Ruling (Motion for Class Certification) Document |
||
March 21, 2024 |
Notice of Remote Appearance Document |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Objection To evidence ISO Opposition to Plantiffs Motion for Summary Judgment Document |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Opposition To Plantiffs Motion for summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication Document |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Declaration of Grace E. Mehta ISO Defendant's opposition to plantiffs motion for summary judgment or in the alternative summary adjudication Document |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Response To Plantiffs Separate statement of undisputed material facts in opposition for summary judgment or in the alternative, summary adjudication Document |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Declaration of Akan Ismaili ISO Defendants Opposition to Plantiffs motion for summary judgment or in the alternative , summary adjudication Document |
||
March 11, 2024 |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Document |
||
March 08, 2024 |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.