Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Doe, Jennifer vs. Lett, Sr., Arnold F. et al
On December 13, 2022 an other tortious action case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA. Judge Thomas J. Perrino presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 13, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 02, 2024
Filing Location
Barnstable County, MA
Category
Torts
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Plaintiff Jennifer Doe (“Plaintifl”) is 4. woman seeking damages for various
incidents of sexual abuse and rape occurring over a period of cight (8) years, beginning when she
was only six (6) years old by Defendant, Amold F, Lett Sr. Defendant”), Jennifer was deeply
traumatized by this sexual abuse and rape, The Complaint seeks damages for these acts,
Causes of Action
COUNT IL-INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS:
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Superior Court of Barnstable, Massachusetts. The plaintiff, Jennifer Doe, is a 25-year-old woman seeking damages for incidents of sexual abuse and rape that occurred over an eight-year period, starting when she was…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Affidavit of Jennifer Doe
Date: Jun 14, 2024APPEARANCE FILED BY Anthony Alva, Esq., for Arnold F. Lett, Jr.
Date: Feb 23, 2024Affidavit of Arnold F. Lett, Jr. in support
Date: Jan 26, 2024Amended: amended complaint filed by Jennifer Doe
Date: Jan 27, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: Dec 13, 2022Original civil complaint filed. With jury demand
Date: Dec 13, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Hearing for Real Estate Attachment scheduled on: 06/27/2024 02:00 PM. Has been: Not Held. For the following reason: No Proper Notice to Parties. Comments: Atty Greenwood did not pick up Summons | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for a Real Estate Attachment and further Preliminary Relief (#19.0): Other action taken Order of notice to issue returnable for hearing on June 27, 2024 at 2:00pm. | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of counsel in support of motion for ex parte real estate attachment and further preliminary relief | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jennifer Doe | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Jennifer Doe's Memorandum in support of motion for ex parte real estate attachment and further preliminary relief | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Jennifer Doe's EX PARTE Motion for a Real Estate Attachment, for a Preliminary Injunction | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Jennifer Doe's EX PARTE Motion for a Real Estate Attachment, for a Preliminary Injunction | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for a Real Estate Attachment and further Preliminary Relief (#19.0): Other action taken Order of notice to issue returnable for hearing on June 27, 2024 at 2:00pm. Judge: Hogan, Hon. Maureen
Judge: Hogan, Maureen |
|
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr.'s Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) | |
June 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#17.0): ALLOWED Pretrial Conference to be scheduled in the February 2025, session. | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER: FOR IMPOUNDMENT This cause came for consideration of the plaintiff's Motion for Non-Disclosure and to Impound Plaintiff's Identity and Biographical Information to the Public (Assented to). After review of the motion and affidavit of counsel the Court has allowed the motion and issued this Order pursuant to Trial Court Rule VIII, Uniform Rules on Impoundment Procedure, Rule 9. The clerk shall IMPOUND any biographical and or identifying information relative to the plaintiff. Counsel shall be primarily responsible for not submitting such biographical and/or identifying data until this case is finally disposed, or until further order of the Court. SO ORDERED (See image for full text). Attested Copies mailed on 05/06/2024 to Kristen T. Greenwood, Esq., 349 Old Plymouth Rd, Sagamore Beach, MA 02562; Scott J. Tucker, Esq., 199 Wells Ave., Newton, MA 02459; Anthony Alva, Esq., 16 School St., P.O. Box 730, Barnstable, MA 02630; Ann M. Donovan, Esq., 199 Wells Ave., Suite 301, Newton. MA, 02459 | |
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Note: On 05/03/2024, the following Papers (#1, #3, #4, #8, #10, #11.2, #11.4, #12.1 and #12.3) were redacted, with the originals and the working redactions separated and sealed in a manila folder, to be maintained as impounded as to all biographical and identifying information relative to the plaintiff in this case. Counsel are primarily responsible for not filing any biographical identifying information relative to the plaintiff. | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to quash Deposition (#12.1): subpoena duces tecum DENIED After hearing and consideration, motion DENIED, for the reasons stated on the record. | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing RE: Discovery Motion(s) scheduled on 04/16/2024: Held as Scheduled Comments: 2nd Session: FTR (REM) Appeared: Defendant - Scott J Tucker, Esq. Other interested party - Anthony Alva, Esq. | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jennifer Doe's Motion for nondisclosure and to impound plaintiff's identity and biographic information to the public. | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for nondisclosure and to impound plaintiff's identity and biographical information to the public (#15.0): ALLOWED pursuant to Trial Court Rule VIII. | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Hearing RE: Discovery Motion(s) scheduled on: 03/19/2024 02:00 PM. Has been: Rescheduled. For the following reason: By Court prior to date | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoens (#14.0): ALLOWED | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Other Interested Party Arnold F. Lett, Jr.'s Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 02/27/2024 02:00 PM Hearing RE: Discovery Motion(s) | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED BY Anthony Alva, Esq., for Arnold F. Lett, Jr. | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing RE: Discovery Motion(s) scheduled on: 02/27/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Thomas J Perrino, Presiding Staff: Scott W Nickerson, Clerk of Courts
Judge: Perrino, Thomas J |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Other Interested Party Arnold F. Lett, Jr.'s Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 02/27/2024 02:00 PM Hearing RE: Discovery Motion(s) | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED BY Anthony Alva, Esq., for Arnold F. Lett, Jr. | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents (#11.1): ALLOWED There being no objection filed, the motion is ALLOWED. | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories (#11.3): ALLOWED There being no opposition, the motion is ALLOWED By the Court (Perrino, J.) Christine Higginbotham, Assistant Clerk. Judge: Perrino, Hon. Thomas J | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Lett, Jr., Arnold F. (Other interested party) | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Lett, Jr., Arnold F. (Other interested party) | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Other Interested Party Arnold F. Lett, Jr.'s Motion to quash Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to P #12.0 filed by Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr. | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Arnold F. Lett, Jr. in support | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Other Interested Party Arnold F. Lett, Jr.'s Motion to quash Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
The Superior Court Doe, Jennifer |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Arnold F. Lett, Jr. in support | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to P #12.0 filed by Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr. | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.'s Memorandum in support of | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Tucker, Esq., Scott J (Attorney) on behalf of Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Lett, Sr., Arnold F., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr. (Defendant) | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.'s Memorandum in support of P. #11.1 | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.'s Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. Applies To: Tucker, Esq., Scott J (Attorney) on behalf of Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Lett, Sr., Arnold F., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr. (Defendant) | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.'s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.'s Motion to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.'s Memorandum in support of P. #11.1 | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.'s Memorandum in support of | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Tucker, Esq., Scott J (Attorney) on behalf of Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr., Lett, Sr., Arnold F., Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr. (Defendant) | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) for discovery by 01/30/2024; for Service of Rule 56 motions by 02/29/2024; for Filing of Rule 56 motions by 04/16/2024; and for final pre-trial conference by 05/24/2024 (#10.0): ALLOWED for discovery by 01/30/2024; for Service of Rule 56 motions by 02/29/2024; for Filing of Rule 56 motions by 04/16/2024; and for final pre-trial conference by 05/24/2024. | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Jennifer Doe, Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.'s Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) for discovery by 01/30/2024; for Service of Rule 56 motions by 02/29/2024; for Filing of Rule 56 motions by 04/15/2024; and for final pre-trial conference by 05/24/2024 | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL; on this date, Alicia M Chouinard, Esq., withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Scott Gowen, Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., and for Defendant Alan Ligouri, Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr.. | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY CLAIM received from Defendants Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr., and Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr. | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr.: Service made at last and usual; on January 10, 2023. | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr.: Service made at last and usual; on February 2, 2023. | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE; on this date, Alicia M Chouinard, Esq., and Ann M Donovan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendants Scott Gowen Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold Lett, Sr. and Alan Ligouri Personal Representative for the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr. | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff files Uniform Counsel Certification. Applies To: Greenwood, Esq., Kristen T (Attorney) on behalf of Doe, Jennifer (Plaintiff) | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Pleading titled, Return of Service upon Scott Gowen, filed with the court on 01/30/2023, returned to Kristen T Greenwood, Esq. There is one named defendant in the body of the complaint, Arnold F. Lett, Sr. The summons lists the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr., as defendant, which is incorrect. The summons is directed to Scott Gowen, who is not a named defendant in the case and for whom there is no allegation that he is the Personal Representative of the Estate of Arnold F. Lett, Sr., as appointed by the Probate Court. Not accepted for filing and docketing as served. Notice of Returned Pleading mailed on 01/30/2023 to Kristen T Greenwood, Esq., 349 Old Plymouth Road, Sagamore Beach, MA 02562 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH JURY DEMAND FILED by Scott J Tucker, Esq., for defendant, Arnold F Lett, Sr. | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended: amended complaint filed by Jennifer Doe | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. With jury demand |