Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
8880 Elder Creek Holdings, A California Limited Liability Corporation, Global Investment Trust- 2017Y, Golden Global Enterprises Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Ehlers, Wesley C.J., Hartford, John J., Lopez, C. Scott, Wilson, Donald A., against Does 1-10, Inclusive, Onderko, Tim, represented by Signorotti, Dominic V, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Healy, Nicole S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHealy, Nicole S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2022 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see or access the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
FINAL_DAW_Declaration_su_pplemental_Exhibit_F
Date: April 15, 2024FINAL_DAW_Declaration_su_with_A_L_excludes_F
Date: April 15, 2024Onderko_MPA_support_MNT
Date: April 15, 2024Notice_Move_for_new_trial_02099
Date: April 03, 2024DAW_Declaration_opposing_with_exhibits_02099
Date: March 12, 2024Exhibit_K_2_Declaratory_Relief_Brief
Date: March 12, 2024DAW_Declaration_Exhibit_K
Date: March 12, 2024DAW_Declaration_Exhibits_H_J
Date: March 12, 2024Exhibit_G_2_AAA_Arbitrators_Award
Date: March 12, 2024Exhibit_G_Transcript_of_arbitration_hearing
Date: March 12, 2024DAW_Declaration_Exhibits_A_F
Date: March 12, 2024DAW_Declaration_opposing_Judgment_02099
Date: March 12, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 24, 2022Complaint
Date: May 24, 202220220616_Amended_Dec_rel_int_Ver_04_CSL_FINAL
Date: June 16, 2022First Amended Complaint
Date: June 16, 202220220622_ATTORNEY_Substi_for_CSL_FULL_SERVICE
Date: June 26, 202220220706_Golden_Global_G__estment_association_
Date: July 05, 202220220705_Onderko_Association_of_Attorneys
Date: July 06, 202220220705_Onderko_Substit__Elder_Creek_Holdings
Date: July 06, 2022Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: June 27, 2022Petition_to_Confirm_Arbitration_Award_Reply
Date: December 21, 20230299_Signed_special_appearance_for_DAW
Date: December 18, 20230299_Digned_Opposition
Date: December 18, 202302099_association_signed_by_DAW_and_GPE
Date: December 14, 202302099_Substitution_of_At__igned_by_Wes_and_DAW
Date: December 14, 2023George_signed_ex_parte_application
Date: December 14, 2023DAW_Declaration_for_Ex_Parte
Date: December 14, 2023Exhibits submitted in support of
Date: June 21, 2023Order
Date: August 07, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: September 14, 2022Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay
Date: August 02, 2023Notice
Date: October 20, 2022Order to Show Cause Hearing
Date: June 28, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 10, 2023Compendium of Index of Exhibits
Date: June 21, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: November 28, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: June 21, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 19, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: May 31, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 26, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 14, 2022Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: June 21, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 21, 2023Order
Date: October 27, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: October 26, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: October 05, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: August 07, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 26, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 26, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: June 02, 2023Order
Date: April 19, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 18, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: July 26, 2022Order
Date: October 26, 2022Order After Hearing
Date: September 14, 2022Proof_of_Service_Onderko
Date: November 28, 2023Petition_To_Confirm_Elis
Date: November 28, 2023Petition_To_Confirm_Arbitration_DVS_Dec_
Date: November 28, 2023Petition_to_Confirm_Arbitration_Award_MP_A
Date: November 28, 2023Petition_to_Confirm_Arbitration_Award_Notice
Date: November 28, 2023Onderko_Petition_to_Compel_Arb_Ntc
Date: July 26, 2022Onderko_Petition_to_Compel_Arb_DVS_Dec
Date: July 26, 2022Onderko_Petition_to_Compel_Arb_Onderko_Dec
Date: July 26, 2022Onderko_Petition_to_Compel_Arb_MPA
Date: July 26, 2022Plaintifs_Objection_to_Arbitration_Petition
Date: September 01, 2022Petition_to_Compel_Arb_REPLY
Date: September 06, 2022Golden_Global_Onderko_Related_Case_Ntc
Date: September 13, 2022Hartford_substitution_of_attorney_out
Date: September 29, 2022Plaintiff_Notice_of_Related_case
Date: October 03, 2022Golden_Wilson_CMS_10_27_2022
Date: October 12, 2022Golden_Global_v_Onderko_Plaintiff_CMS
Date: October 13, 2022Notice_of_Court_order
Date: October 20, 2022Onderko_CMS_01_10_2023
Date: December 21, 202222_civ_02099_and_22civ02332_DAW_CMC_for_041823
Date: April 06, 20232023_05_31_Second_Petition_to_Compel_Arb_MPA
Date: May 31, 20232023_05_31_POS_Second_Pet_to_Compel
Date: May 31, 20232023_05_31_Second_Petiti_to_Compel_Arb_Notice
Date: May 31, 20232023_05_31_Second_Petiti_Compel_Arb_DVS_Decl
Date: May 31, 20232023_05_31_Second_Petiti_Onderko_Dec_SIGNED_
Date: May 31, 20232023.06.01 Sub of Attorney Golden
Date: June 02, 20232023.06.01 Sub of Attorney Don
Date: June 02, 202377277Subst00ba3c
Date: June 13, 202377277Subst0183cc
Date: June 13, 202377996REQUE027a93
Date: June 26, 202377996DECLA03e637
Date: June 26, 202377996PLAIN0152c1
Date: June 26, 202377996Proof003119
Date: June 26, 20232023.07.20 RJN FINAL
Date: July 20, 20232023.07.20 MPA Opp Compel Arb
Date: July 20, 2023POS (FINAL)
Date: July 20, 20232023.07.20 Wes Dec FINAL
Date: July 20, 20232023.07.20 Wilson Dec FINAL
Date: July 20, 20232023_07_25_Second_Petiti_Arbitration_DVS_Decl
Date: July 25, 20232023_07_25_Second_Petiti_el_Arbitration_Reply
Date: July 25, 20232023_07_25_Second_Petiti_tration_Lockhart_Dec
Date: July 25, 20232023_07_25_Second_Petiti_rb_Onderko_Dec_Reply
Date: July 25, 20232023_07_25_POS_Reply_re_Pet_to_Compel
Date: July 25, 2023Request for Court Reporter (00016581xBEBF1)
Date: July 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | 02099_Amended_Notice_to_Move_for_new_Trial | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL_DAW_Declaration_su_pplemental_Exhibit_F | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL_DAW_Declaration_su_with_A_L_excludes_F | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Onderko_MPA_support_MNT | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice_Move_for_new_trial_02099 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | DAW_Declaration_opposing_with_exhibits_02099 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibit_K_2_Declaratory_Relief_Brief | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | DAW_Declaration_Exhibit_K | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | DAW_Declaration_Exhibits_H_J | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibit_G_2_AAA_Arbitrators_Award |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.