Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Jane Be Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ashley Taylor Rayfield, Courtney Meghan Thom, Courtney Pauline Pendry, John Clinton Manly, Morgan Alan Stewart, (total of 5) See All against Big Brothers Big Sisters Of America, A California Corporation, Big Brothers Big Sisters Of Monterey County, A California Corporation, Big Brothers Big Sisters Of Salina, A California Corporation, Boys & Girls Clubs Of Monterey County, A California Corporation, Jon David Woody, (total of 5) See All represented by Alison Mcnaboe Crane, Mark Heisy, Michael Anthony Kruppe, Paul Damien Caleo, Tara A Murray, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Brief
Date: April 08, 2022Ex Parte to Advance MTN to Enforce Settlement
Date: March 25, 2024DCP ISO Ex Parte to Advance Mtn to Enforce
Date: March 25, 2024DCP ISO Mtn to Enforce Settlement Agmt
Date: March 22, 2024Mtn to Enforce Settlement Agmt
Date: March 22, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 22, 2024Dec. of CPP re. Dismissal JANE BE DOE
Date: February 29, 2024ANSWER to FAC
Date: January 14, 2022SF76776.3433400.JANE (BE) - Answer to FAC(64258622.1)
Date: January 19, 2022243275.739114.234122.720390.234122 POS
Date: January 22, 2022DECLA OF CARLOS
Date: February 08, 2022DECLA OF COURNEY
Date: February 08, 2022DECLA OF KEVIN
Date: February 08, 2022DECLA OF KEVIN ANTUNEZ
Date: February 08, 2022CASE
Date: February 08, 2022CMS
Date: February 11, 202202-15-22 POS FAC Stmt of Damages on Woody
Date: February 25, 20222022.3.7 - Def. Ex Parte Notice
Date: March 05, 20222022.3.7 - Dec to Ex Parte
Date: March 05, 20222022.3.7 - Def. Prop Order
Date: March 05, 2022DecofCPendryISOOpptoBBBSAExParte
Date: March 08, 2022Opp to BBBSA 3.8.22 Ex Parte_FINAL
Date: March 08, 2022Summons on FAC
Date: March 09, 2022Default Package-Woody
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Lodgment REDACTED
Date: April 08, 2022decla
Date: April 08, 2022Proposed Order (04.15.22 Hearing)_FINAL
Date: April 20, 20222022.04.26 - Def. CMC Statement (5.17.2022)
Date: April 26, 20222022.04.26 - Ntc of Remote App to CMC (5.17.2022)
Date: April 26, 2022SF90982.CMS
Date: April 28, 2022CMC 5-17-22 FINAL
Date: April 29, 2022Exhibit F Part 1 Pages from DEC of AMC ISO MTC-3
Date: May 02, 2022Pages from Exhib E Pages from DEC of AMC ISO MTC
Date: May 02, 2022Ex F part 2 Pages from DEC of AMC ISO MTC-4
Date: May 02, 2022MTC- Sep Stmt
Date: May 02, 2022A-D Pages from DEC of AMC ISO MTC
Date: May 02, 2022MTC-MPA
Date: May 02, 2022MTC- Notice and Motion
Date: May 02, 2022MTC [Proposed] Order
Date: May 02, 2022Ex. G- M to DEC of AMC ISO MTC
Date: May 03, 2022Ex. E to DEC of AMC ISO MTC
Date: May 03, 2022Ex. F to DEC of AMC ISO MTC
Date: May 03, 2022286532.919630.CARMEL PINE CONE DECL OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 17, 2022Decl. of Courtney P. Pendry ISO Opp FINAL
Date: May 20, 2022SS ISO Opp to MTC FINAL
Date: May 20, 2022Opp to MTC RFA Set One and Frogs Set Two-FINAL
Date: May 20, 2022Default Package BBBSMC
Date: June 13, 2022Caption & POS BBBSMC
Date: July 15, 2022BBBSMC- POS (002)
Date: July 15, 2022Objection to Ntc of Related Case
Date: December 12, 2023DOE (BE) - Ntc Related Case(84156978.1)
Date: December 08, 2023Proposed Order -final
Date: November 28, 2023SF176727.2notice
Date: November 27, 2023SF176727.notice
Date: November 27, 2023Default Package BBBSMC 7-20-22
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance CP CT
Date: November 22, 2023SF176727.order
Date: November 27, 2023SF176727.2order
Date: November 27, 2023SF176392.NOTICE
Date: November 22, 2023Default Package BBBSMC 7-20-22
Date: August 25, 20222023.11.22 - Def. Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: November 22, 20232023.11.22 - Def. Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: November 22, 2023Order after Ruling (MSJ)
Date: November 21, 2023SF176039.SCS
Date: November 20, 20232023.11.17 - Def. MSC Statement
Date: November 18, 2023MSC Statement_final
Date: November 18, 2023SF176392.ORDER
Date: November 22, 20232023.11.21 - Def. Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: November 22, 2023Order after Ruling (MSJ)
Date: November 20, 2023Decl. of CPP ISO MTC SRog Set 2-PUBLIC FILE
Date: November 16, 2022NTC of Lodgment_final-PUBLIC FILE
Date: November 16, 2022SStmt MTC BBBSA Resp. to SROG 2-PUBLIC FILE
Date: November 16, 2022MTC BBBSA Resp. to SROG Set 2-PUBLIC FILE
Date: November 16, 2022[Proposed] Order-PUBLIC FILE
Date: November 16, 2022468069C.1776110.Compendium_part_2
Date: November 13, 2023468069C.1776109.compendium_1
Date: November 13, 2023prop order
Date: November 28, 2022amnd ntc mtn
Date: November 28, 2022AMENDED MTC BBBSA Resp. to SROG Set 2 1-27-23
Date: December 01, 2022[Proposed] Order- 1-27-23
Date: December 01, 2022mtn
Date: December 02, 2022DEC
Date: June 17, 2023OPP
Date: June 17, 2023Ex Parte to Continue MSJ FINAL
Date: June 26, 2023Decl. of CPP ISO Ex Parte to Continue MSJ
Date: June 26, 2023decl
Date: June 26, 2023oppo 1
Date: June 26, 2023Mtn_to_Seal__Second_Amended
Date: November 09, 2023MTC OPP (Pending)
Date: January 14, 2023MTC OPP (Pending) - Redeacted Sep Stmt
Date: January 14, 2023MTC OPP (Pending) Ntc of Lodgment
Date: January 14, 2023MTC OPP (Pending) Dec of TAM
Date: January 14, 2023decl
Date: January 20, 2023reply
Date: January 20, 2023Amended Proposed Order 1.27.2023
Date: January 27, 2023Proposed Order 1.27.2023
Date: January 27, 2023Decl. of CPP ISO MPO
Date: February 07, 2023Mtn for Protective Order final
Date: February 07, 2023Proposed Order
Date: February 07, 2023Mtn_for_Protective_Order
Date: February 08, 2023Decl
Date: February 08, 20232023.03.13 - BBBSA Opp to Pltf MPO
Date: March 13, 20232023.03.13 - BBBSA Opp MPO - Dec of TAM
Date: March 13, 2023392789.1384419.Reply_ISO_Mtn
Date: March 17, 2023392789.1384418._ISO_Reply
Date: March 17, 2023DEC of TAM re Discovery Referee
Date: April 20, 2023MPA(76943112.1)
Date: May 17, 2023RJN(76805355.1)-compressed
Date: May 17, 2023NOTICE(76939641.1)
Date: May 17, 2023BAIRD DECL.(76943190.1)
Date: May 17, 2023SSMF(76941974.1)
Date: May 17, 2023FERRARO DECL.(76805719.1)
Date: May 17, 2023HEISEY DECL.(76943245.1)
Date: May 17, 2023Disclosure Checklist Reports and POS (1)
Date: May 24, 202381980DEFEN017bb1
Date: September 01, 202381980PLAIN02d299
Date: September 01, 202381980DEFEN00ba95
Date: September 01, 2023sep stmt
Date: September 06, 20232023.010.06 - MSJ - Dec of AMC
Date: October 06, 20232023.10.06 - MSJ MPA
Date: October 06, 20232023.10.06 - MSJ - Notice
Date: October 06, 20232023.010.06 - MSJ - Sep Stmt
Date: October 06, 2023Mtn_to_Seal_Amended
Date: October 10, 2023Mtn_to_Seal__Prop_Order_Amended
Date: October 10, 2023MPA_Amended__PUBLIC
Date: October 10, 2023Notice_of_Lodgment_Amended_PUBLIC
Date: October 10, 2023SSUMF__Amended_Public
Date: October 10, 2023RJN_PUBLIC
Date: October 10, 2023of_CPP_Amended_PUBLICfinal
Date: October 10, 2023comp
Date: October 10, 2023CPP_ISO_Mtn_to_Seal_Amended
Date: October 10, 2023ntc of lodg
Date: October 11, 2023sep stmt
Date: October 11, 2023Mtn_to_Seal_Amended
Date: October 11, 2023oppo
Date: October 11, 2023dec
Date: October 11, 2023rfjn
Date: October 11, 2023ntc compend
Date: October 11, 2023mtn
Date: October 20, 2023Proposed_Order
Date: October 20, 2023decla
Date: October 20, 2023sep stmt
Date: November 10, 2023oppo
Date: November 10, 2023ntc lodg
Date: November 10, 2023rfjn
Date: November 10, 2023decl
Date: November 10, 2023decl
Date: November 09, 2023Mtn_to_Seal
Date: August 25, 2023sep stmt
Date: August 25, 2023evid obj
Date: August 25, 2023decl
Date: August 25, 2023exh list (2)
Date: August 25, 2023oppo
Date: August 25, 2023rfjn
Date: August 25, 2023Notice of Ruling re discovery referee
Date: November 07, 2023Ex Parte to Advance Sanctions Motion
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies) | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Ex Parte to Advance MTN to Enforce Settlement | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | DCP ISO Ex Parte to Advance Mtn to Enforce | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | DCP ISO Mtn to Enforce Settlement Agmt | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Mtn to Enforce Settlement Agmt | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.