Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nutt, Henry, Nutt, Kevin, Nutt, Lola, Nutt, Tyrone, Nutt, Vashon, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Asfc, Llc, Aspen Skilled Healthcare, Inc., Irwin-Singh, D.O., Crystal, Saint Agnes Medical Center, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 15, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: May 10, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 11, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 10, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: February 23, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 23, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 23, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: February 24, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 24, 2021Order Denied
Date: August 24, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 11, 2021Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: May 12, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 28, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Opposition filed
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: August 25, 2021Statement filed
Date: August 25, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: August 25, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Statement filed
Date: August 25, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 11, 2022Reply filed
Date: March 23, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: November 09, 2021Opposition filed
Date: March 21, 2022Opposition filed
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: November 09, 2021Opposition filed
Date: March 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: March 30, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: August 25, 2021Order Denied
Date: November 03, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: August 25, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: April 05, 2022Proof of Service
Date: August 26, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 27, 2021Opposition filed
Date: March 21, 2022Opposition filed
Date: March 21, 2022Letter Received
Date: December 06, 2021Reply filed
Date: April 05, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Statement filed
Date: November 09, 2021Opposition filed
Date: March 21, 2022Amended Document Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: June 23, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: May 05, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: October 19, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: September 27, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: September 27, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2022ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: October 19, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 31, 2023Summons issued and filed
Date: February 10, 2023Amended Document Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: March 24, 2023Order Received for Signature
Date: March 08, 2023Application and Order to Extend Time file
Date: March 09, 2023Order Received for Signature
Date: March 23, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 7-10 Days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
03/24/23 -Stipulation and Order filed Regarding Second Amended Complaint with Respect to Deft. Saint Stipulation and Order filed Regarding Second Amended Complaint with Respect to Deft. Saint Agnes Medical Center Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/23/23 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Second Amended Complaint Order Received for Signature FWD to 503 - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Second Amended Complaint |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application and Order to Extend Time file Order extending time to serve and file the pleading is GRANTED Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/8/23 Amended Ex Parte for Order Extending Time Order Received for Signature Order signed and issued. FWD clerk's office 03/09/23 for further processing FWD to 503 - AMENDED Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time to Serve Pleading; [Proposed] Order |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/8/23 Ex Parte and Proposed Order to Extend Time Order Received for Signature *Order Amended by Counsel* - Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time to Serve Pleading; [Proposed] Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.