Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Dusty Kawai presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDusty Kawai Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders Filed by: Marzec, James (Respondent) | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Civil Harassment Prevention Filed by: Vanaman, Christopher (Petitioner) As to: Marzec, James (Respondent) Service Date: 03/28/2024 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders scheduled for 04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 34
Judge: Dusty Kawai |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing - Civil Harassment Prevention Filed by: Vanaman, Christopher (Petitioner) As to: Marzec, James (Respondent) | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Temporary Restraining Order CLETS-TCH: Result: Granted | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order CLETS-TCH Filed by: Vanaman, Christopher (Petitioner) As to: Marzec, James (Respondent) | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Amy Van Sickle in Department 34 Hall of Justice
Judge: Dusty Kawai |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders Filed by: Vanaman, Christopher (Petitioner) As to: Marzec, James (Respondent) | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice Filed by: Vanaman, Christopher (Petitioner) | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment Filed by: Vanaman, Christopher (Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.