Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re Case Designation) | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order Re Case Designation)] Generated by: Court | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Loncto, Kathleen (Plaintiff) Service Date: 04/02/2024 Service Cost: 140.70 | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (In Re Disqualification of Judge (CCP § 170.6)) of 04/03/2024 Filed by: Clerk | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Hall of Justice in Department 41 Reason:
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/25/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 40
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (In Re Disqualification of Judge (CCP § 170.6)) | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Reassignment Worksheet Generated by: Court | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 09/11/2024 at 08:35 AM in at Department 40 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/03/2024
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.