Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 41
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order re Case Designation)] Generated by: Court | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order re Case Designation) | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 08/30/2024 at 08:35 AM in at Department 41 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/10/2024
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 08/30/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 41
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance Generated by: Court | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Ronda McKaig in Department 41 Hall of Justice
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Hernandez, Hugo Lee (Plaintiff) | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed by: Hernandez, Hugo Lee (Plaintiff) As to: Advanced Structural Technologies Inc (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.