Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Substituted Service) Filed by: Perez, Salvador (Plaintiff) As to: First Kia (Defendant) Service Cost: 130.00 Cost Waived: No Mailing Date: 04/11/2024 | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Perez, Salvador (Plaintiff) As to: Kia America, Inc. (Defendant) Service Date: 04/08/2024 Service Cost: 40.00 | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Proof of Personal Service: Service Date: 04/08/2024 Service Cost: 40.00 | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 09/13/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 21
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance Generated by: Court | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed by: Perez, Salvador (Plaintiff) As to: First Kia (Defendant); Kia America, Inc. (Defendant) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Jeffrey G. Bennett in Department 21 Hall of Justice
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Perez, Salvador (Plaintiff) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment Generated by: Court | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Perez, Salvador (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.