Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Xxxxxx Xxxxxxx, Xxxxx Xxxxxxx, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Asit S Panwala, against Arun Ravidran, represented by Michael Francis Brown, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Christopher G. Rudy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher G. Rudy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1266 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1267 days |
Order: Submitted Matter
Date: August 14, 2019Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Date: June 29, 2017Conference: Trial Setting
Date: November 14, 2017Conference: Trial Setting
Date: June 12, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: October 04, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: October 30, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: March 28, 2019Conference: Settlement
Date: April 17, 2019Jury Trial: Long Cause
Date: April 23, 2019Motion: Strike
Date: June 28, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 19, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 03, 2019Declaration
Date: June 03, 2019Order: Submitted Matter
Date: July 23, 2019Motion: Strike
Date: May 28, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2019Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: June 03, 2019Declaration
Date: June 19, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: June 03, 2019Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: May 22, 2019Exhibit List (Party)
Date: May 17, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: May 16, 2019Jury Fees Posted
Date: May 13, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: May 16, 2019Notice
Date: May 20, 2019Proof of Service
Date: May 20, 2019Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: May 16, 2019Motion: Strike
Date: May 16, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: May 20, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 16, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: May 28, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: May 02, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 01, 2019Order: Disposition of Exhibits
Date: April 29, 2019Judgment
Date: May 13, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: January 22, 2019Application for Refund
Date: May 03, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 17, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: December 31, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: September 26, 2018Order
Date: October 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 30, 2018Statement
Date: September 26, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 26, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: February 26, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 09, 2017Stipulation
Date: February 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 01, 2016Minute Order
Date: November 14, 2017Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2019Order: Ex Parte
Date: February 01, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: February 01, 2019Separate Statement
Date: January 22, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 22, 2019Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: February 01, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: January 22, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 03, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: September 26, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: June 04, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: June 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 12, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: June 04, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: May 18, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: May 16, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: May 15, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 16, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: May 15, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: February 26, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: May 15, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: May 18, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: May 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 19, 2017Stipulation
Date: May 15, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2017Minute Order
Date: October 06, 2016Other
Date: May 03, 2019Exhibit List (Party)
Date: April 22, 2019Verdict
Date: April 19, 2019Exhibit List (Party)
Date: April 19, 2019Declaration
Date: September 26, 2018Proof of Service
Date: February 26, 2018Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 23, 2019Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: December 24, 2018Proof of Service
Date: May 15, 2018Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: May 14, 2018Verdict
Date: April 30, 2019Proof of Service: Mail
Date: April 04, 2019Proof of Service
Date: May 29, 2018Proof of Service
Date: September 26, 2018Jury Instructions (Proposed)
Date: April 17, 2019Proof of Service: Mail
Date: January 22, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 19, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 22, 2019Exhibit List (Party)
Date: April 22, 2019Proof of Service
Date: May 21, 2018Other
Date: April 17, 2019Verdict
Date: April 17, 2019Jury Instructions (Proposed)
Date: April 19, 2019Exhibit List (Party)
Date: April 17, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 31, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: August 03, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Statement
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Separate Statement
Date: August 03, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: March 28, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: August 03, 2018Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued
Date: April 19, 2018Application: Renewal Judgment
Date: April 19, 2018Declaration
Date: April 19, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 19, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: April 04, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 19, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: December 31, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Brief: Trial
Date: April 19, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Response/Reply
Date: September 27, 2018Order: Proposed
Date: August 03, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: April 04, 2019Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: May 29, 2018Brief: Trial
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: December 31, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Statement
Date: April 19, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Application
Date: May 21, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 03, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Response/Reply
Date: March 04, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: December 31, 2018Request
Date: April 02, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: August 27, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 22, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: December 31, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: April 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice Request for Dismissal |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice: Case Status | |
July 13, 2021 | Hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document: Other List of Proposed Pleadings/Orders |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.