Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
103 B Street Llc, 120 E. Church Ave. Llc, 1220 Nadeau St. Llc, 1562 Seabright Avenue Llc, 157 East Panama Road Llc, (total of 11) See All filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Manlin Roger A. S. Esq., against Karic Hamburg, Lee Ann, Martin Gregg, Milner Steve, represented by Lee Ann S. Esq., Martin Gregg A., Moten Keith Joseph, Manlin Roger A. S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Robert B. Broadbelt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert B. Broadbelt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management137 days |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions237 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Reply Opposition; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Reply opposition to motion to disqualify counsel; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Order re: Motion to Disqualify Cross-Complainants' Attorneys; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Opposition Demurrer; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Order re Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions and Production of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order re Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Reply reply to opposition to mtn disqualify; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- "U"; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant); As to: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 157 East Panama Road, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 6363 Lindbergh, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 120 E. Church Ave., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 103 B Street, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 1562 Seabright Avenue, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 1615 N. Downs, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 921 W. Inyokern Road, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 1220 Nadeau St., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Continuance HEARING; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ann Lee (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Gregg Martin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ann Lee (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Gregg Martin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gregg Martin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Steve Milner (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00Order re: XDeft;s Motion for Atty Fees; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Steve Milner (Cross-Defendant); As to: Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-05-19T00:00:00Order re Motion for Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-10-03T00:00:00Order re Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Keith J. Moten; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Plaintif...)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-12-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Steve Milner (Cross-Complainant); As to: Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant); As to: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Date of Plff's IDC; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Order re: Motion for Trial Preference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Order re: Demurrer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Motion re: Motion for Trial Continuance; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff); As to: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Summons On Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff); As to: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff); As to: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference pursuant to CCP 36(a) and 36.5; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Roger Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Order on Ex Parte Application; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate Equitable Claims filed by Defe...)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Cross-...)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion re: TO TAX COSTS; Filed by: Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff); As to: Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: March 08, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 08, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 08, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONSENT TO SERVICE BY EMAIL
Date: May 01, 2019Answer
Date: May 28, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: May 28, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 17, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 23, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: July 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING DATE FOR IDC PER RESERVATION
Date: August 16, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED IDC
Date: August 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: August 28, 2019Motion for Trial Preference - MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CCP 36(A) AND 36.5
Date: August 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 03, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: September 03, 2019Informal Discovery Conference
Date: September 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 11, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: September 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;)
Date: September 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: September 25, 2019Order - ORDER RE: MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: September 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE;)
Date: September 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: September 26, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 04, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED DATE OF PLFF'S IDC
Date: October 11, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S X-COMPLAINT
Date: October 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC);)
Date: October 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 31, 2019Separate Statement
Date: November 13, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANT'S EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION
Date: November 19, 2019Separate Statement
Date: November 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION ISO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 27, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 27, 2019Exhibit List
Date: November 27, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: December 03, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 04, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: December 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION BY DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT (STEVE MILNER) AND CROS...)
Date: December 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RE-FILING POS OF X-C PREVIOUSLY FILE ON 7/23/19 IN RESPONSE TO OSC
Date: December 09, 2019Motion to Bifurcate
Date: December 11, 2019Witness List
Date: December 13, 2019Exhibit List
Date: December 13, 2019Trial Brief
Date: December 13, 2019Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: December 18, 2019Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO...)
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: December 23, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 27, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 27, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: December 31, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: January 03, 2020Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO BIFURCATE EQUITABLE CLAIMS OFF CALENDAR
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEE ISO MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 10, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED IDC
Date: February 05, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 18, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: March 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2020
Date: March 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)
Date: April 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)
Date: April 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS
Date: April 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020
Date: April 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/06/2020
Date: August 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 06, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/17/2020
Date: September 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR
Date: October 07, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/14/2020
Date: October 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 27, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/27/2020
Date: October 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/18/2020
Date: November 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND REVOCATION THIS COU...)
Date: December 03, 2020Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISQUALIFY CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' ATTORNEYS
Date: December 22, 2020Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 03, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 10, 2020Reply - REPLY OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: December 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 14, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/14/2020
Date: December 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' A...)
Date: December 22, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 23, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION DEMURRER
Date: December 31, 2020Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: January 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 07, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/07/2021
Date: January 07, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: January 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/14/2021
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 14, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/27/2021
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 18, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/18/2021
Date: February 18, 2021Reply - REPLY CROSS-COMPLAINANTS OPPOSITION TO MANLIN'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: February 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/25/2021
Date: February 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 25, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/01/2021
Date: March 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 04, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/04/2021
Date: March 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 09, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/09/2021
Date: March 09, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/22/2021
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 29, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/29/2021
Date: March 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARINGS
Date: April 01, 2021Order - ORDER RE MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT;
Date: April 06, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/12/2021
Date: April 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/19/2021
Date: April 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 24, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Motion to Disqualify Counsel - MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL [PART 1 OF 2 PARTS]
Date: June 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: June 03, 2021Motion to Disqualify Counsel - MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL [PART 2 OF 2 PARTS]
Date: June 02, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: June 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 15, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 18, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MTN DISQUALIFY
Date: June 24, 2021Motion to Bifurcate
Date: June 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 30, 2021Status Report
Date: July 12, 2021Trial Brief
Date: July 19, 2021Exhibit List
Date: July 19, 2021Witness List
Date: July 19, 2021Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: July 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 23, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 23, 2021Writ - Return
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO CROSS-COMPL...)
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 03, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL "U"
Date: September 09, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: November 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 19, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/19/2021
Date: November 19, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/07/2021
Date: December 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Continuance
Date: December 08, 2021Judgment
Date: December 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' A...)
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 25, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 09, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 29, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: August 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL;)
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: September 12, 2022Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: October 17, 2022Writ of Execution
Date: October 17, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: October 17, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 31, 2022Proof of Service - No Service
Date: October 19, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: October 31, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)
Date: November 01, 2022Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE HEARING
Date: November 03, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 19, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 24, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: May 26, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 13, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/20/2020
Date: August 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 20, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/13/2020
Date: August 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 04, 2020Separate Statement
Date: September 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 14, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 26, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 05, 2023Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: June 06, 2023Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Order (re: Demurrer to Cross-Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing Date for IDC Per Reservation) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Defendant's Expert Witness Designation) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference (pursuant to CCP 36(a) and 36.5) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice (of Consent to Service by Email) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Cross-Compl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Steve Milner (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Date of Plff's IDC) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC);)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Summons (On Cross-Complaint) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff); Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Order (re: Motion for Trial Preference) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION BY DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT (STEVE MILNER) AND CROS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice (Of Status Of MSC Final Status Conference) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Reply (Opposition) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion for Trial Continuance) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice (of motion to disqualify counsel) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Case Management Conference; Order to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Hearings) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Steve Milner (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Order re: Motion to Disqualify Cross-Complainants' Attorneys Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (Demurrer) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U" Appeal) Filed by Roger Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration and Revocation this Cou...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Cross-Complainants' A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Order (re Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions and Production of Documents) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Cross-Compl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Reply (opposition to motion to disqualify counsel) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Reply (reply to opposition to mtn disqualify) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("U") Filed by Roger Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 921 W. Inyokern Road, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Status Conference re Appeal;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference re Appeal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 6363 Lindbergh, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE CONTINUANCE ON HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate Equitable Claims filed by Defe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 157 East Panama Road, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 1615 N. Downs, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Cross-...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 1220 Nadeau St., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 120 E. Church Ave., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 1562 Seabright Avenue, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Cross-Complainants' A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Taking Matters Off Calendar P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (HEARING) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 103 B Street, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Ann Lee (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Gregg Martin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Gregg Martin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Ann Lee (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference re: issuance of...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Gregg Martin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Defendant's Expert Witness Designation) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion for Trial Continuance) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Reply (Opposition) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Case Management Conference; Order to...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Cross-Complainants' A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Summons (On Cross-Complaint) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Order re: Motion to Disqualify Cross-Complainants' Attorneys Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice (Of Status Of MSC Final Status Conference) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration and Revocation this Cou...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Hearings) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("U") Filed by Roger Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U" Appeal) Filed by Roger Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Cross-Compl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice (of motion to disqualify counsel) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Reply (reply to opposition to mtn disqualify) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 157 East Panama Road, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 1562 Seabright Avenue, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 103 B Street, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (HEARING) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 1615 N. Downs, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference re Appeal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Status Conference re Appeal;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Cross-Complainants' A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 6363 Lindbergh, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Taking Matters Off Calendar P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 120 E. Church Ave., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate Equitable Claims filed by Defe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE CONTINUANCE ON HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Gregg Martin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Cross-...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Ann Lee (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 921 W. Inyokern Road, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 1220 Nadeau St., LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice (of Consent to Service by Email) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Steve Milner (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing Date for IDC Per Reservation) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Cross-Compl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Order (re: Demurrer to Cross-Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference (pursuant to CCP 36(a) and 36.5) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Order (re: Motion for Trial Preference) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Order (re Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions and Production of Documents) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Opposition (Demurrer) Filed by Roger Manlin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC);)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION BY DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT (STEVE MILNER) AND CROS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Steve Milner (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Date of Plff's IDC) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Reply (opposition to motion to disqualify counsel) Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff); Steve Milner (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Roger A. S. Manlin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Trial Preference)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference;))
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference;))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Order (re: Motion for Trial Preference)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC);))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Date of Plff's IDC)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's x-complaint)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Order (re: Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Cross-Compl...))
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to R4PD & Request for Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Defendant's Expert Witness Designation)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Summons (On Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENCE AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $14,472 AGAINST PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION BY DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT (STEVE MILNER) AND CROS...))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of Re-Filing POS of X-C Previously File on 7/23/19 in Response to OSC)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of Non Opposition to Defendant and Cross-Complainants' Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion for Trial Continuance)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Reconsider and Revoke this Court's Order of 12/09/19 Granting Motion to Compel
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Case Management Conference; Order to...))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice (Of Status Of MSC Final Status Conference)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Trial Continuance)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (- Manlin Supplemental Declaration re Notice)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion for Trial Continuance)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Defendant/Cross-Complainants' Motion for Issue, Evidence and/or Sanctions)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Bifurcate Equitable Claims Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing on Defendant/Cross-Complainants' Motion for Discovery Sanctions)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defen...))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Lee ISO Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice (of Continued IDC)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Reply (ISO Defendant's Motion for Issue, Evidence, and Monetary Sanctions)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defen...))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answers to Deposition Questions and Production of Documents (and for Sanctions))
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Response (FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFEDANT STEVE MILNER'S DEMAND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Brief (IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS COMPLAINTS' MOTION FOR ISSUE, EVIDENCE, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing on Motion for Discovery Sanctions)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/05/2020)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/29/2020)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS? MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/01/2020)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS? MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/20/2020)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS? MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/06/2020)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS? MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/13/2020)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/20/2020)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))])
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Reply (Opposition)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/17/2020)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (- Answer to Request for Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT AND CROSSCOMPLAINANTS? MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/14/2020)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS? SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/21/2020)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/11/2021)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/24/2021)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice (of motion to disqualify counsel)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/15/2021)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Reply (reply to opposition to mtn disqualify)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/30/2021)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate (Equitable Claims filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainants on 06-29-2021;)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION FROM PLAINTIFF; AND DECLARATION OF ANN S. LEE, ESQ.)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF ROGER MANLIN?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Cross-Compl...))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U")
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U" Appeal)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Judgment (Dismissing Manlin X-Comp)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/19/2021)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees (and Costs filed by Cross-Defendants on 11-01-2021;)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/07/2021)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("U")
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate Equitable Claims filed by Defe...))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Order (re Motion to Bifurcate Equitable Claims filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainants on 06-29-2021)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Cross-Complainants' A...))
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice (of Consent to Service by Email)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice (of Continued IDC)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing Date for IDC Per Reservation)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference (pursuant to CCP 36(a) and 36.5)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 08/28/2019)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continued IDC)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/27/2020)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/18/2020)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration and Revocation this Cou...))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Reply (opposition to motion to disqualify counsel)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/14/2020)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Order re: Motion to Disqualify Cross-Complainants' Attorneys
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel Cross-Complainants' A...))
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Opposition (Demurrer)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/07/2021)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/14/2021)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/27/2021)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/18/2021)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Reply (Cross-complainants opposition to Manlin's motion to disqualify)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/25/2021)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/01/2021)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/04/2021)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/09/2021)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/22/2021)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/29/2021)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Order (re Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions and Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Hearings)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions a...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant;)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/12/2021)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/19/2021)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel ([Part 1 of 2 Parts])
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel ([Part 2 of 2 Parts])
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.