Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Judge Michael, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Dunn Brian, Dunn Brian Thomas, Dunn Brian Thomas Esq., Gyongyos Megan, Gyongyos Megan R. Esq., (total of 5) See All against 1 Through 50 Inclusive Does, Barragan Deputy Edwin, County Of Los Angeles, Judge Michael, represented by Cantrall Melinda, Kizzie Antonio, Kizzie Antonio K Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: February 27, 2019Trial Brief; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 3; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Response REPLY IS JNOV MOTION; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 5; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Jury Question as to Deputy Gilbert Jurado; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review -- re Exhibits) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 4; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Helen Chung MD; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Statement of the Case -- proposed; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Deputy Edwin Barragan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Memorandum in support of motion for new trial; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Jury Question as to Michael Judge; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jury Question as to Ernest Burwell; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Jury Question for prospective jurors in Department 2; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Question as to Sergeant John Cook; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 1; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Joseph CHang, M.D. Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Jurors Letters Received on from Jurors #1, #8, and #10. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Objection to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Objection Joint Designations Chart and Objections; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Special Verdict Form; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Jury Question as to Jessica Rawlins; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Jury Question as to Deputy Veronica Fantom; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Question as to Dr. Richard Leff; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Jury Instructions -- refused and withdrawn; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Deputy Edwin Barragan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration of Edward Lyman; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Jury Question as to Dr. Joseph Chang; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration of Juror 12; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions -- given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 2; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Reply Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice Designating Exhibits for Transmittal; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Michael Judge (Respondent)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript N.O.A. ; B318649; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid; Filed by:
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Deputy Edwin Barragan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Order on Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict and For a New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: September 27, 2019Answer
Date: April 22, 2019Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 24, 2020Separate Statement
Date: April 23, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 23, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020
Date: April 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 28, 2020Separate Statement
Date: August 25, 2020Separate Statement
Date: August 31, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: September 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 25, 2020Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: February 25, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 29, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 30, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 5
Date: August 06, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 4
Date: August 06, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 3
Date: August 06, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 1
Date: August 06, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 2
Date: August 06, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: August 11, 2021Exhibit List
Date: August 11, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: August 11, 2021Witness List
Date: August 11, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 30, 2021Jury Question
Date: August 30, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: August 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 03, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 10, 2021Jury Question
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 09, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO ERNEST BURWELL
Date: September 10, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO JESSICA RAWLINS
Date: September 13, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO SERGEANT JOHN COOK
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 17, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO JOHNNY GILBERT JURADO
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 20, 2021Special Verdict - SPECIAL VERDICT FORM
Date: September 21, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS -- REFUSED AND WITHDRAWN
Date: September 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 21, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS -- GIVEN
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 25, 2021Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: November 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: November 04, 2021Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: November 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/17/2021
Date: November 17, 2021Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS
Date: November 22, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: November 22, 2021Response - RESPONSE REPLY IS JNOV MOTION
Date: November 24, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVCE
Date: November 29, 2021Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: November 29, 2021Motion for New Trial
Date: December 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: December 06, 2021Order - ORDER ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT AND FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: January 07, 2022Motion for Reconsideration
Date: January 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (POST MOTION))
Date: January 28, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: February 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DEFENDANT'S MOTION))
Date: February 09, 2022Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: February 23, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: February 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: March 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW -- RE EXHIBITS)
Date: February 08, 2023Notice - NOTICE DESIGNATING EXHIBITS FOR TRANSMITTAL
Date: December 21, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSITING ADDITIONAL FUNDS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS
Date: April 19, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/22/2023
Date: February 22, 2023Notice - NOTICE DESIGNATING EXHIBITS FOR TRANSMITTAL
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 22, 2023Statement of the Case Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Jury Question as to Johnny Gilbert Jurado; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 2) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice to Defendants to Appear at Trial) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 5) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Objection (Joint Designations Chart and Objections) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Court Order Re: Referral to Resolv...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Deputy Edwin Barragan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-- given) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Jurors Letters Received on from Jurors #1, #8, and #10. Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Johnny Gilbert Jurado) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-- refused and withdrawn) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Deputy Veronica Fantom) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Dr. Joseph Chang) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order and Notice of Entry of Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Helen Chung MD) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Special Verdict (Form) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS TO APPEAR AT TRIAL
Date: August 12, 2021Trial Brief
Date: August 13, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PATRICK MANNING
Date: August 19, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LEE WILLIAMS
Date: August 19, 2021Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: August 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSEPH CHANG, M.D.
Date: August 23, 2021Exhibit List
Date: August 24, 2021Witness List
Date: August 24, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: August 24, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HELEN CHUNG MD
Date: August 25, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: August 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 26, 2021Objection - OBJECTION JOINT DESIGNATIONS CHART AND OBJECTIONS
Date: August 27, 2021Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE -- PROPOSED
Date: August 30, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION FOR PROSPECTIVE JURORS IN DEPARTMENT 2
Date: August 30, 2021Jury Question
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 02, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO DR. RICHARD LEFF
Date: September 13, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S COUNTER DESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF TRACIE KING
Date: September 13, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO DEPUTY VERONICA FANTOM
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 13, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO DEPUTY GILBERT JURADO
Date: September 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 14, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO DR. JOSEPH CHANG
Date: September 14, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION AS TO MICHAEL JUDGE
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 15, 2021Jury Question - JURORS LETTERS RECEIVED ON 9/15/21 FROM JURORS #1, #8, AND #10.
Date: September 15, 2021Jury Instructions - AMENDED JOINT UNDISPUTED CONCLUDING JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: September 16, 2021Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 1) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph CHang, M.D.) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Statement of the Case (-- proposed) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Deputy Gilbert Jurado) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Jury Question (for prospective jurors in Department 2) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Michael Judge) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Sergeant John Cook) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Memorandum (in support of motion for new trial) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Deputy Edwin Barragan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 4) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 3) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Servce Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference) of )
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Objection (Joint Designations Chart and Objections)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Lee Williams)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANTS TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING DEPONENT UNAVAILABILITY TO APPEAR AT TRIAL)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Patrick Manning)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 3)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Jury Question (for prospective jurors in Department 2)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case (-- proposed)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 2)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging Electronic Trial Binders)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice to Defendants to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 5)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (-- Sandra Guerra CSR#10977)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph CHang, M.D.)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 4)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 1)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO BIFURCATE PUNITIVE DAMAGE)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Attorney Edward M Lyman III in Opposition to Defendants' MSJ (Exhibits 28-41))
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Helen Chung MD)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Defendants Evidence In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Borenstein, Dept. 2, Spring Street Court, OTR today at 1:30 p.m.)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO BIFURCATE PUNITIVE DAMAGES)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Court Order Re: Referral to Resolv...))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Joint Chart of Page and Line Designation(s) for Deposition and Former Testimony of Lee Williams
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Jessica Rawlins)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Johnny Gilbert Jurado)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Dr. Richard Leff)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict (On Battery Claim)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Dr. Joseph Chang)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Amended Joint Undisputed Concluding Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit AFFIDAVITS ATTACHED, NA; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Jessica Rawlins) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Dr. Richard Leff) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Declaration (PLAINTIFF'S COUNTER DESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF TRACIE KING)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order and Notice of Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Special Verdict (Form)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Memorandum (in support of motion for new trial)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Lyman)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Deputy Veronica Fantom)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Jurors Letters Received on from Jurors #1, #8, and #10.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Deputy Gilbert Jurado)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-- refused and withdrawn)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-- given)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Sergeant John Cook)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Antonio K. Kizzie Regarding [Proposed] Judgment on Special Verdict)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Motion for New Trial and JNOV)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Michael Judge)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (N.O.A. ; B318649)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Response (REPLY IS JNOV MOTION)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (-- Timothy J. McCoy CSR#4745)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging Discovery Produced by Defendants and Select Trial Exhibits
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Order on Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict and For a New Trial
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Defendant's Motion For Reconsid...))
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Reporter's Transcripts in Support of Motions for JNOV and New Trials.)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Servce
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial and Judgment Nothwithstanding...))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to extend the time to file Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Juror 12)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration (OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL;)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Post Motion)))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Defendant's motion)))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Motion for New Trial (Amended notice)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Defendant's Motion For Reconsid...) of )
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO BIFURCATE PUNITIVE DAMAGES)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO BIFURCATE PUNITIVE DAMAGE)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 5)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 1)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 2)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 4)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MIL 3)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Court Order Re: Referral to Resolv...))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice to Defendants to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging Electronic Trial Binders)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Lee Williams)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Patrick Manning)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Joseph CHang, M.D.)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Objection (Joint Designations Chart and Objections)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Helen Chung MD)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Borenstein, Dept. 2, Spring Street Court, OTR today at 1:30 p.m.)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case (-- proposed)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Question (for prospective jurors in Department 2)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANTS TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING DEPONENT UNAVAILABILITY TO APPEAR AT TRIAL)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (-- Sandra Guerra CSR#10977)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Jessica Rawlins)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Dr. Richard Leff)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Deputy Veronica Fantom)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Declaration (PLAINTIFF'S COUNTER DESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF TRACIE KING)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Deputy Gilbert Jurado)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Dr. Joseph Chang)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Michael Judge)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jurors Letters Received on 9/15/21 from Jurors #1, #8, and #10.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Johnny Gilbert Jurado)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Special Verdict (Form)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Jury Question (as to Sergeant John Cook)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-- given)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions (-- refused and withdrawn)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Antonio K. Kizzie Regarding [Proposed] Judgment on Special Verdict)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order and Notice of Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict (On Battery Claim)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum (in support of motion for new trial)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Lyman)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Juror 12)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Motion for New Trial and JNOV)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/17/2021)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Response (REPLY IS JNOV MOTION)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to extend the time to file Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Reporter's Transcripts in Support of Motions for JNOV and New Trials.)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Motion for New Trial (Amended notice)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Defendant's motion)))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (-- Timothy J. McCoy CSR#4745)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration (OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL;)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial and Judgment Nothwithstanding...))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Defendant's Motion For Reconsid...))
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Post Motion)))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Lyman) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict (On Battery Claim) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for New Trial) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant); Deputy Edwin Barragan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Motion for New Trial (Amended notice) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Defendant's Motion For Reconsid...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (N.O.A. ; B318649) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial and Judgment Nothwithstanding...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Order on Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict and For a New Trial Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Post Motion))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Juror 12) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Response (REPLY IS JNOV MOTION) Filed by Michael Judge (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Defendant's motion))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Defendants Evidence In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Attorney Edward M Lyman III in Opposition to Defendants' MSJ (Exhibits 28-41))
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.