Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Friends Of The Willow Glen Trestle, Willow Glen Trestle Conservancy, filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case against California Department Of Fish And Wildlife, City Of San Jose, City Of San Jose Department Of Public Works, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Joseph Huber presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 04, 2018 |
CategoryEnvironmental/Toxic Tort Unlimited (30) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time655 days |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 04, 2018Response/Reply
Date: October 04, 2018Request
Date: June 07, 2019Appeal: Notice of Abandonment
Date: December 14, 2018Order: Proposed
Date: June 10, 2019Hearing: OSC TRO/Preliminary Injunction
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 27, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: November 16, 2018Appeal: Notice of Completion
Date: August 07, 2019Request
Date: October 05, 2018Statement
Date: October 09, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: June 28, 2019Non-Opposition
Date: June 05, 2019Request
Date: October 05, 2018Judgment
Date: July 24, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: June 06, 2019Order: Submitted Matter
Date: June 12, 2019Request
Date: October 05, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: June 03, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: June 06, 2019Request
Date: October 05, 2018Request
Date: October 05, 2018Request
Date: June 24, 2019Order
Date: May 28, 2019Order
Date: October 24, 2018Application and Order: Ex Parte
Date: October 04, 2018Hearing: Exparte Application
Date: October 04, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: December 21, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: February 15, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: February 22, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: April 12, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: May 24, 2019Motion: Order
Date: June 10, 2019Hearing: Other
Date: June 27, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 04, 2018Order: Proposed
Date: October 04, 2018Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee)
Date: October 04, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 05, 2018Brief
Date: October 05, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: October 05, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 10, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 10, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: October 16, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: October 18, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 14, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 16, 2018Abandonment: Appeal
Date: November 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 21, 2018Request
Date: December 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 22, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 22, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 12, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 24, 2019Motion: Preliminary Injunction
Date: June 03, 2019Brief
Date: June 03, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 07, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 10, 2019Respondent's Brief
Date: June 11, 2019Brief
Date: June 11, 2019Dismissal
Date: June 14, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 18, 2019Request
Date: June 18, 2019Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: June 18, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 24, 2019Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: June 28, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: July 31, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: July 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Remittitur - Dismissal of Appeal H047068 |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Notice of Completion H047068 |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance H047068 |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Amended Memorandum of Costs |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs CSJ's Memorandum of Costs |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Deposit: Clerk's Transcript $100 check taken on Notice of Undocumented Action, H047068 |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judge Kuhnle) *see for details |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Appellant's Default Notice H047068 |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Designation H047068 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.