Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mukai Jeffery K, against Casillas Diego A, represented by Dehbozorgi Sam, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Randy Rhodes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandy Rhodes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint
Date: August 30, 2018Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
Date: August 30, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: August 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 30, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: August 30, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 21, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 01, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 28, 2018Declaration (name extension) - Declaration In Support Of Judgment
Date: November 28, 2018Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP 1033
Date: November 28, 2018Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: January 10, 2019Notice of Limited Scope Representation - Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: June 25, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))
Date: August 07, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))
Date: August 14, 2019Answer - Answer to Complaint
Date: August 15, 2019Order (name extension) - Order of Exemption from Electronic Filing and Service
Date: August 15, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: filing of Answer/Trial Setting Confer...)
Date: November 14, 2019Reply (name extension) - [Proposed] Answer to Unverified Complaint
Date: November 26, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Answer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by: DIEGO A CASILLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: As to: DIEGO A CASILLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) . Filed by: DIEGO A CASILLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA (Plaintiff); As to: DIEGO A CASILLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Default entered as to DIEGO A CASILLAS; On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA on 08/30/2018
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Default entered as to DIEGO A CASILLAS; On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA on 08/30/2018
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Affidavit Re Non-Military Status; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: DIEGO A CASILLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Declaration In Support Of Judgment; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Declaration CCP 1033; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Default Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NA on 08/30/2018, Default entered on 11/28/2018, Vacated - .
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Order of Exemption from Electronic Filing and Service; Filed by: DIEGO A CASILLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 24, 2020Answer to Complaint; Filed by: DIEGO A CASILLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00[Proposed] Answer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by: DIEGO A CASILLAS (Defendant)
Date: November 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.