Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Homeowners Arroyo West, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Horowitz Elsa, Medioni Daniel M, against Homeowners Arroyo West, Wolf Rifkin Shapiro Schulman & Rabkin Llp, Younis Emad S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Daniel Medioni; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Declaration; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Order for Publication; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff); As to: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Opposition To Plaintiff's opposition; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Proposed Statement on Appeal Submitted APP-104 CR-135/143; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Appellant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal AMENDED; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Appeal - Referral of Statement on Appeal for Certification BV033016; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 11, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS on
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action; Filed by:
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL MEDIONI; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed BV033016; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-5
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Reply OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE FRAUD DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Default entered as to EMAD S YOUNIS; On the Complaint filed by ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS on
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Writ of Writ of Sale (Real Property); Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Appeal - Statement on Appeal Settled/Certified BV033016; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Appellant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal BV033016; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Declaration CCP 585; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Declaration Emad Younis; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid RESPONDENT PAID $84.82; Filed by:
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Declaration of publication; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Appeal - Request for Court-Paid Clerk's Transcript Granted; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Motion to Vacate judgement; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Hearing on Motion to Set Asid...)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: May 30, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees - Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: May 08, 2020Reply (name extension) - Reply OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE FRAUD DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 31, 2020Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: August 19, 2020Motion for Sanctions - Motion for Sanctions
Date: August 26, 2020Motion to Tax Costs - Motion to Tax Costs
Date: July 22, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion to Set...)
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs;)
Date: February 01, 2022Motion to Tax Costs - Motion to Tax Costs
Date: March 02, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: July 11, 2022Complaint
Date: May 16, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - by fax
Date: September 12, 2018Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate judgement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Daisy FLores; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 11, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 07, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 06, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 08, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 13, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 11, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 22, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 25, 2019Motion to Vacate (name extension) - judgement
Date: August 15, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 02, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 23, 2019Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Vacate judgement)
Date: September 13, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate judgement) of 09/13/2018
Date: September 13, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate judgement)
Date: October 30, 2018Motion for Reconsideration - Motion for Reconsideration
Date: January 22, 2019Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Vacate judgement)
Date: September 11, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate judgement)
Date: December 20, 2018Motion to Tax Costs - Motion to Tax Costs
Date: February 07, 2019Motion to Tax Costs - Motion to Tax Costs
Date: February 11, 2019Answer - Answer to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs, Declaration
Date: April 02, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: April 04, 2019Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/05/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid RESPONDENT PAID $84.82; Filed by:
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/12/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) of 12/11/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Reply OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE FRAUD DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Writ of Writ of Sale (Real Property); Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action; Filed by:
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Daniel Medioni; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Order for Publication; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff); As to: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL MEDIONI; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Declaration of publication; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Daisy FLores; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS on 05/16/2017
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Default entered as to EMAD S YOUNIS; On the Complaint filed by ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS on 05/16/2017
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Declaration CCP 585; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Vacate judgement; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Declaration; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Opposition To Plaintiff's opposition; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Declaration Emad Younis; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/09/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Appellant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Proposed Statement on Appeal Submitted APP-104 CR-135/143; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Appellant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EMAD S YOUNIS (Defendant); As to: ARROYO WEST HOMEOWNERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.