Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michael G. Ackerman filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against James Brown, represented by William Reid Cumming, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time705 days |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text again?
Jury Trial: Long Cause
Date: March 11, 2019Motion: New Trial
Date: May 24, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: February 05, 2019Motion: Order
Date: June 14, 2019Hearing: Other
Date: December 08, 2017Hearing: Other
Date: November 14, 2017Conference: Case Management
Date: August 01, 2017Order
Date: May 17, 2019Hearing: Demurrer
Date: August 08, 2017Minute Order
Date: June 14, 2019Order
Date: May 13, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 24, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: May 07, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 10, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 03, 2019Response/Reply
Date: May 09, 2019Response/Reply
Date: May 07, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 29, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 19, 2019Judgment
Date: April 09, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: April 23, 2019Judgment
Date: April 22, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 19, 2019Order: Submitted Matter
Date: February 26, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: April 17, 2019Judgment
Date: April 09, 2019Order: Disposition of Exhibits
Date: March 19, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2019Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: March 08, 2019Order
Date: June 04, 2018Response/Reply
Date: January 31, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 05, 2019Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: February 27, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: December 21, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: November 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 17, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: January 31, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 11, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 21, 2017Minute Order
Date: August 08, 2017Notice: Entry of Order
Date: July 02, 2018Separate Statement
Date: November 21, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 28, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 28, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 06, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 03, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 08, 2017Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2017Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: May 10, 2019Notice: Settlement
Date: July 02, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: April 19, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: November 07, 2019Motion: Other
Date: April 23, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: April 03, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 11, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: September 11, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: May 15, 2019Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: October 01, 2020Statement
Date: March 11, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: December 21, 2018Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: February 26, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 05, 2019Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: November 07, 2019Response/Reply
Date: May 03, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: May 15, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 07, 2019Statement
Date: March 11, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: May 03, 2019Brief
Date: June 24, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: June 03, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: August 15, 2019Abandonment: Appeal
Date: July 10, 2019Conference: Settlement Jury
Date: March 06, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 20, 2018Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: June 14, 2019Declaration: In Opposition
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration: In Opposition
Date: December 21, 2018Order: Proposed
Date: April 12, 2019Brief: Trial
Date: March 08, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 05, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 29, 2019Statement
Date: March 08, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: May 03, 2019Stipulation
Date: April 29, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: April 09, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: April 16, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: November 18, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 21, 2018Brief
Date: March 11, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: June 19, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 6 |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal *Amended* partial with prejudice by atty Cumming as to cross complaint filed 8-18-17 only Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal partial without prejudice by atty Cumming as to cross complaint filed 8-18-17 only Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
November 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 9 |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal partial with prejudice by atty Ackerman as to the Complaint only |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Abandonment: Appeal | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Abandonment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.