Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Moniz, Rachel, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Cottrell, Carolyn Hunt, against Adecco Usa, Inc., Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Does 1 To 9, represented by Siegel, Adam, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2017 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial700 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions806 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time806 days |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Declaration in Support
Date: July 25, 2017Case Management Order
Date: September 07, 2017Answer
Date: September 21, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: May 31, 2017Ex Parte
Date: May 31, 2017Order
Date: May 31, 2017Order for Permissive eFiling and Amendment of CMC Order #1
Date: June 21, 2017Complex Case Status Conference
Date: June 20, 2017Declaration
Date: May 31, 2017Order
Date: June 20, 2017Case Management Order
Date: June 21, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: July 06, 2017Response
Date: July 06, 2017Declaration
Date: November 17, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 17, 2017Ex Parte Order
Date: July 06, 2017Motion
Date: November 17, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: May 11, 2018Separate Statement
Date: May 11, 2018Separate Statement
Date: May 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 11, 2018Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: May 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 15, 2018Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion
Date: June 08, 2018Demurrer to
Date: July 25, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 08, 2018Objections to Evidence
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited
Date: July 11, 2018Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues
Date: June 22, 2018Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: October 03, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2017Declaration
Date: December 05, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: November 27, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2017Case Management Order
Date: November 08, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 05, 2017Motion for Order
Date: December 12, 2017Case Management Order
Date: January 18, 2018Case Management Order
Date: December 14, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 08, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 23, 2019Notice
Date: January 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 10, 2018Case Management Order
Date: April 30, 2019Notice
Date: April 30, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: May 13, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 13, 2019Notice
Date: April 25, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 24, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 26, 2018Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: May 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 03, 2019Notice
Date: June 12, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: July 02, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: June 04, 2019Judgment
Date: July 03, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: July 29, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 05, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: June 14, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: July 17, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: June 11, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: July 17, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 17, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: July 17, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: July 17, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 05, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: August 14, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 02, 2019Case Management Order
Date: July 22, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 15, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: July 25, 2019Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: August 26, 2019Objections to Evidence
Date: August 05, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 05, 2019Order
Date: August 27, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: September 06, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 06, 2019Case Management Order
Date: August 08, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 15, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 09, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 15, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate
Date: August 16, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 15, 2019Case Management Order
Date: August 16, 2019Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: August 15, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 22, 2019Ex Parte Opposition
Date: August 15, 2019Case Management Order
Date: August 22, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion for Joinder
Date: September 06, 2019Declaration in Reply
Date: October 04, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: September 09, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 22, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 19, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 07, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 07, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 08, 2019Order
Date: January 09, 2020Motion to Approve Settlement
Date: October 16, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 19, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 08, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: March 13, 2020Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited
Date: January 21, 2020Motion to Unseal Records
Date: October 16, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 19, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 19, 2019Objection
Date: September 20, 2019Motion
Date: September 23, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 23, 2019Declaration in Opposition
Date: March 13, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: September 23, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: March 13, 2020Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited
Date: March 19, 2020Joinder
Date: March 16, 2020Amended Notice Of
Date: March 19, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 01, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 04, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 01, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: October 03, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 07, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 02, 2019Stipulation
Date: October 08, 2019Appellant's Notice of Designation
Date: February 04, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 07, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: February 25, 2020Motion
Date: March 05, 2020Judgment
Date: February 10, 2020Motion
Date: February 26, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: March 05, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 05, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: March 05, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 13, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: March 18, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 18, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: March 26, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: March 26, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: April 02, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: March 26, 2020Appellant's Notice of Designation
Date: March 30, 2020Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Appeal - Civil Unlimited
Date: April 03, 2020Order
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: April 29, 2020Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: April 30, 2020Motion to Sanction
Date: June 10, 2020Memorandum of Costs
Date: May 21, 2020Notice of Withdrawal
Date: June 02, 2020POS - Stipulation220310
Date: March 11, 2022Moniz- Stip to Continue FINAL220310
Date: March 11, 2022170.6
Date: March 16, 2022170.6 ([Proposed] Order)
Date: March 16, 2022170.6 (POS)
Date: March 21, 2022Stip Proposed Order to Continue Hearing
Date: March 28, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Entry of Order Continuing Hearing
Date: March 31, 2022MOTION
Date: April 15, 2022DEC
Date: April 15, 2022POS
Date: April 15, 2022PROPOSED ORDER
Date: April 15, 2022Order
Date: May 05, 2022Proof of Service
Date: May 05, 2022Opposition
Date: May 05, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 05, 2022POS - Stipulation220310
Date: May 10, 2022Moniz- Executed 220509
Date: May 10, 2022Renewed Mtn for Approval FOR FILING-1
Date: May 12, 2022POS - Motion220511-5
Date: May 12, 2022Stip and Proposed Order 211008 -4
Date: May 12, 2022RFJN FINAL 220511-3
Date: May 12, 2022Dec of DCL FINAL 220511-2
Date: May 12, 2022POS of Agreement on LWDA 220513
Date: May 13, 2022Opp to Correa Renewed MTI_FINAL 220513-1
Date: May 13, 2022POS for Opposition 220313-2
Date: May 13, 2022Proof of Service by
Date: July 06, 2017Hearing on Demurrer
Date: September 06, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 31, 2017Notice
Date: June 20, 2017Notice
Date: October 03, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 18, 2017Notice
Date: December 18, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 17, 2017Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation
Date: April 18, 2017Proof of Service on CORPORATION, LLC, etc.
Date: May 01, 2017Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation
Date: June 16, 2017Notice
Date: May 03, 2017Notice
Date: June 16, 2017Proof of Service by
Date: December 08, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 29, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 23, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: September 06, 2017Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 20, 2017Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 21, 2017Declaration
Date: December 05, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 23, 2017Affidavit of Mailing
Date: December 14, 2017Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 21, 2017Affidavit of Mailing
Date: November 08, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 03, 2017Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: March 21, 2018Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: March 21, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: November 07, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 05, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: June 20, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: November 27, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 25, 2018Proof of Service by
Date: January 09, 2018Stipulation
Date: March 15, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: January 18, 2018Stipulation
Date: March 19, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 19, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: February 23, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: May 11, 2018Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 15, 2018Notice RE: Appellant's Default
Date: October 01, 2018Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: April 19, 2018Motion (Unlimited Case First Appearance Fee)
Date: April 11, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 24, 2018Proof of Service by
Date: May 11, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 26, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: April 26, 2018Proof of Service by MESSENGER SERVICE of
Date: May 11, 2018Notice
Date: July 30, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: July 27, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: January 24, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: June 06, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: January 22, 2019Affidavit of Mailing
Date: May 14, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: February 22, 2019Notice RE: Appellant's Default
Date: October 03, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: June 08, 2018Clerk's Certificate - 8.124 - Register of Actions
Date: October 23, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 13, 2019Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 06, 2018Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: June 20, 2018Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 27, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: August 01, 2018Discovery Conference
Date: August 01, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: July 31, 2018Deposition Designations for Trial
Date: July 20, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 23, 2018Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 19, 2018Proof of Service by
Date: May 14, 2019Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 15, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: May 15, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 13, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 22, 2019Affidavit of Mailing
Date: August 10, 2018Clerk's certificate
Date: September 17, 2018Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: October 17, 2018Clerk's Certificate RE: Dismiss Appellant's Default
Date: October 10, 2018Clerk's Certificate RE: Certifying Record to Court of Appeal
Date: October 23, 2018Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept
Date: October 30, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: October 31, 2018Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 30, 2018Settlement Hearing
Date: June 11, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 25, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 02, 2019Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept
Date: January 17, 2019Proof of Service by
Date: May 03, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 15, 2019Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: May 03, 2019Settlement Hearing
Date: May 24, 2019Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 03, 2019Affidavit of Mailing
Date: July 03, 2019Motion
Date: July 17, 2019Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 07, 2017Proof of Service by
Date: December 05, 2017Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: June 08, 2018Affidavit of Mailing
Date: May 21, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: July 26, 201859352NOTIC000ea2
Date: June 22, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: May 01, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: May 13, 2019Order
Date: May 21, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 03, 2019Application
Date: May 20, 2019SF34006825
Date: November 01, 2022Notice
Date: September 21, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: May 29, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: August 15, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: May 15, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: July 29, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: May 14, 2019Motion for Approval FINAL 221227
Date: December 28, 2022Decl of DCL 221222
Date: December 28, 2022Exhibits 1-13 (First Set)
Date: December 28, 2022POS 221227
Date: December 28, 2022Exhibits 14-21 (Second Set)
Date: December 28, 2022LWDA POS (with exhibit) 221227
Date: December 28, 202269348NOTIC0093e9
Date: January 17, 2023Dec
Date: January 19, 2023POS
Date: January 19, 2023Objections and Oppositions
Date: January 19, 202369428Amend00c598
Date: January 18, 2023Moniz_Reply in Support of Approval_FINAL230124
Date: January 24, 202369783DEFEN00049b
Date: January 25, 2023Baker Decl.
Date: March 02, 2023Sagafi Decl.
Date: March 02, 2023Paola Correas Fee Motion
Date: March 02, 2023Proof of Service
Date: March 02, 2023Decl of DCL 230315
Date: March 16, 2023Moniz _Opp to Correa Fees_ FINAL 230315
Date: March 16, 2023SF34011769 OPPO
Date: March 16, 2023SF34011769 DEC
Date: March 16, 2023SF34011769 POS
Date: March 16, 2023POS 230315
Date: March 16, 2023POS 230316
Date: March 16, 20232023-03-17 Correa Notice of Appeal
Date: March 17, 20232023-03-17 Correa Notice of Appeal
Date: March 21, 2023POS
Date: March 23, 2023Reply Brief
Date: March 23, 2023Request
Date: April 06, 2023Proposed Order
Date: April 06, 2023Designating
Date: April 18, 2023Rs notice
Date: May 03, 2023notice of appeal
Date: May 12, 2023May 24 Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: May 24, 2023Ps LWDA POS
Date: June 29, 2023Ps NOE
Date: June 29, 2023POS 230629
Date: June 29, 2023Proposed judgment 230630
Date: June 30, 2023Ps Notice of lodging
Date: June 30, 2023Notice of entry of judgment
Date: August 03, 2023Notice of Intention
Date: August 14, 2023Notice of Appeal
Date: August 14, 2023Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: August 24, 2023Correas MPA ISO Notice of Intention
Date: August 24, 202382115Defen00ff76
Date: September 06, 2023Moniz_ Opposition for New Trial FINAL 230905
Date: September 06, 202382112Decla00bdb8
Date: September 06, 2023Moniz_ Notice of Errata 230905
Date: September 07, 2023Correa Reply
Date: September 11, 2023Designating Record
Date: October 16, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 15, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 13, 2019Declaration
Date: April 24, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: July 06, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 13, 2019Remittitur
Date: April 24, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: June 03, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: June 08, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: May 01, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 14, 2019Order
Date: July 31, 2018Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: June 08, 2018Order
Date: November 22, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 29, 2019Declaration
Date: November 17, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: May 11, 2018Stipulation
Date: February 23, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: July 29, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 01, 2019Ex Parte Declaration
Date: August 08, 2019Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Date: December 06, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 08, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: July 29, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration
Date: April 26, 2018Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 18, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 18, 2017Notice of Complex Case Status Conference
Date: April 18, 2017Complaint
Date: April 18, 2017Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: June 16, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 16, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: July 06, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 25, 2017Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 25, 2017Reply
Date: August 29, 2017Notice
Date: August 23, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: July 25, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 23, 2017Joint
Date: July 20, 2017Declaration in Opposition
Date: July 06, 2017Motion for Leave
Date: May 03, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 08, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 15, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 15, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 15, 2018Motion In Limine
Date: July 27, 2018Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: August 20, 2018Order
Date: August 01, 2018Notice of Filing of Appeal
Date: September 18, 2018Case Management Order
Date: August 10, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 14, 2019Case Management Order
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Errata
Date: May 14, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: May 14, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 22, 2019Objection
Date: May 23, 2019Defendant's Brief re:
Date: June 03, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 13, 2019Order
Date: July 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Designating Record | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Correa Reply | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Moniz_ Notice of Errata 230905 | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | 82115Defen00ff76 | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Moniz_ Opposition for New Trial FINAL 230905 | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | 82112Decla00bdb8 | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Designating Record on Appeal | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Correas MPA ISO Notice of Intention | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.