Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Clearview Industries Inc, Moler, Patsy, filed a(n) Unlimited Fraud (16) case represented by Ring, Michael P, against Clearview Industries Inc, Hulme, Chris, Hulme, Jennifer, represented by Bennion, Jeffrey M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2013 |
CategoryUnlimited Fraud (16) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order, Filed
Date: August 23, 2017Summons Issued, Filed
Date: July 01, 2013Notice, Filed
Date: July 03, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: July 01, 2013Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt, Filed
Date: August 06, 2013Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 06, 2013Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 06, 2013Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: October 16, 2013Document, Filed
Date: December 04, 2013Notice of Non-availability, Filed
Date: March 17, 2014Document, Filed
Date: March 27, 2014Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: October 10, 2014Declaration, Filed
Date: December 30, 2014Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: October 10, 2014Document, Filed
Date: December 23, 2014Notice of Change of Address, Filed
Date: February 20, 2015Proof of Service, Filed
Date: March 04, 2015Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: April 08, 2015Opposition, Filed
Date: May 01, 2015Document, Filed
Date: May 13, 2015Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: May 19, 2015Proof of Service, Filed
Date: June 10, 2015Notice, Filed
Date: June 10, 2015Declaration, Filed
Date: June 10, 2015Declaration, Filed
Date: June 10, 2015Declaration, Filed
Date: June 10, 2015Proof of Service, Filed
Date: June 29, 2015Notice, Filed
Date: July 14, 2015Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: July 27, 2015Proof of Service, Filed
Date: July 30, 2015Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: July 31, 2015Order, Received
Date: September 29, 2015Appendix
Date: September 30, 2015Proof of Service by Mail, Filed
Date: September 30, 2015Summons Issued, Filed
Date: October 01, 2015Notice of Errata
Date: October 01, 2015Notice of Unavailability, Filed
Date: October 06, 2015Objection, Filed
Date: October 09, 2015Document, Filed
Date: October 14, 2015Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt, Filed
Date: October 22, 2015Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: October 22, 2015Demand for Trial by Jury, Filed
Date: November 23, 2015Order After Hearing, Filed
Date: December 18, 2015Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: December 18, 2015Readiness & Settlement Conference
Date: January 08, 2016Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: February 16, 2016Notice of Non-availability, Filed
Date: February 24, 2016Proof of Service, Filed
Date: March 23, 2016Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: July 01, 2016Motion, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Notice, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Document, Received
Date: July 06, 2016Document, Received
Date: July 06, 2016Document, Received
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Request, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Witness List, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: July 15, 2016Exhibit List, Filed
Date: July 18, 2016Declaration, Filed
Date: July 18, 2016Brief, Filed
Date: July 20, 2016Declaration, Filed
Date: July 18, 2016Brief, Filed
Date: July 20, 2016Jury Instructions Proposed, Filed
Date: July 21, 2016Motion, Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Document, Filed
Date: August 26, 2016Jury Instructions Proposed, Filed
Date: August 30, 2016Jury Instructions Proposed, Filed
Date: August 26, 2016Special Verdict, Filed
Date: September 02, 2016Special Verdict, Filed
Date: September 02, 2016Jury Instructions Proposed, Filed
Date: August 31, 2016Special Verdict, Filed
Date: September 02, 2016Motion, Filed
Date: September 06, 2016Special Verdict, Filed
Date: September 02, 2016Jury Instructions Given, Filed
Date: September 07, 2016Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: September 07, 2016Special Verdict, Filed
Date: September 07, 2016Document, Filed
Date: September 07, 2016Courtroom Clerk Exhibit List, Filed
Date: January 24, 2017Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: January 30, 2017Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: May 10, 2017Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: November 10, 2015Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: August 24, 2017Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: July 17, 2017Brief, Filed
Date: January 17, 2017Judgment, Filed
Date: July 03, 2017Judgment, Received
Date: May 08, 2017Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: December 03, 2014Motion, Filed
Date: August 29, 2016Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed
Date: February 06, 2017Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 01, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 22, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 08, 2016Opposition, Filed
Date: September 30, 2015Reply, Filed
Date: October 09, 2015Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed
Date: July 17, 2017Reply, Filed
Date: July 29, 2015Trial Brief, Filed
Date: July 21, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 05, 2015Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: June 27, 2014Opposition, Filed
Date: January 06, 2016Amended: , Filed
Date: August 23, 2017Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 01, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 10, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 07, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 27, 2016Opposition, Filed
Date: June 29, 2015Case Management Order, Filed
Date: March 04, 2015Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 29, 2014Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: November 23, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 30, 2016Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: March 08, 2016Reply, Filed
Date: December 09, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 03, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 19, 2016Reply Brief, Filed
Date: May 06, 2015Reply, Filed
Date: December 30, 2014Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 21, 2013Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: September 29, 2015Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: December 04, 2013Answer to Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: September 24, 2013Case Management Order, Filed
Date: February 26, 2014Order, Filed
Date: July 30, 2015Separate Statement, Filed
Date: June 10, 2015Reply, Filed
Date: December 31, 2013Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: June 22, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: August 24, 2017Opposition, Filed
Date: August 26, 2016Trial Brief, Filed
Date: July 21, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: June 21, 2017Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 30, 2013Opposition, Filed
Date: December 04, 2015Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: July 07, 2017Motion, Filed
Date: July 17, 2017Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 10, 2016Amended Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: December 08, 2015Opposition, Filed
Date: August 30, 2016Motion, Filed
Date: November 17, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 12, 2016Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed
Date: June 22, 2017Separate Statement, Filed
Date: September 30, 2015Separate Statement, Filed
Date: April 08, 2015Trial Brief, Filed
Date: July 18, 2016Opposition, Filed
Date: July 23, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 20, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 04, 2015Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: January 11, 2016Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 08, 2016Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: June 24, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 10, 2016Reply, Filed
Date: October 09, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 30, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 29, 2016Order, Filed
Date: November 02, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 28, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 18, 2016Reply, Filed
Date: January 11, 2016Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed
Date: July 17, 2017Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 08, 2016Opposition, Filed
Date: June 27, 2016Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: August 21, 2013Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: May 27, 2015Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: July 30, 2015Separate Statement, Filed
Date: July 06, 2015Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: April 04, 2014Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 20, 2015Opposition, Filed
Date: July 30, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 30, 2016Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 13, 2014Opposition, Filed
Date: December 24, 2013Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: July 22, 2014Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 21, 2017Separate Statement, Filed
Date: December 04, 2013Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 23, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 09, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 26, 2014Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: March 27, 2014Objection, Filed
Date: September 30, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 21, 2017CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: May 01, 2014Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 21, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 08, 2014Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 13, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 31, 2016Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: August 21, 2013Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 09, 2014Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: July 01, 2013Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: July 06, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 14, 2015Opposition, Filed
Date: December 22, 2014Motion: Attorney Fees
Date: August 21, 2017Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 14, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 17, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: June 10, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 25, 2015Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: May 27, 2015Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: March 27, 2014Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed
Date: July 15, 2013Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: June 29, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 02, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 26, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 18, 2017Demurrer, Filed
Date: December 22, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 01, 2017Order, Filed
Date: March 27, 2014Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 02, 2016Objection, Filed
Date: October 09, 2015Case Management Order, Filed
Date: March 23, 2016Separate Statement, Filed
Date: December 03, 2014Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 16, 2013Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 07, 2016Brief, Filed
Date: August 30, 2016Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 13, 2015Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: September 25, 2015Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 29, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: June 10, 2015Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: November 10, 2015Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: August 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY S FEES & COSTS |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed /AMENDED JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Order, Filed GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY S FEES & COSTS |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order, Filed | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order, Filed Granting Mot for Atty's Fees & Costs Judge: Herman, James E |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Special Verdict on Cross-Comp Amended: , Filed |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended: , Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.