Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Planet T Uniforms, Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Di Pietro, David, against Discovery Schools Inc, Florida Charter Foundation, Inc., Iuniforms Inc, Rogers, Jon Thomas, Shellow, Richard, (total of 6) See All represented by David, Christopher M, Esq., Kelly, Robert P, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBowman, John B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2014 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a Third Amended Complaint filed by Planet T Uniforms, Inc. against Florida Charter Foundation, Inc. d/b/a Franklin Academy Charter School, Discovery Schools, Inc., iUniforms, Inc., Richard Shellow, Jon Thomas Rogers, and Scott Sznit...
Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: June 19, 2015Request for Production
Date: July 31, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 19, 2014Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 12, 2015Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 24, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: August 29, 2014Objection to Notice to Produce
Date: August 21, 2014Order
Date: March 31, 2014Motion to Correct Scriveners Error
Date: March 24, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: August 29, 2014Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: July 31, 2014Response to Motion
Date: June 19, 2015Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: April 08, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 20, 2018Objection Pursuant to Rule 1.351
Date: March 15, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: September 09, 2018Motion
Date: June 28, 2018Affidavit in Support
Date: March 18, 2019Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: June 15, 2018Motion
Date: July 09, 2018Order
Date: September 28, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 18, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: September 25, 2018Order Denying
Date: April 23, 2019Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: May 03, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 08, 2018Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: April 18, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 09, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 13, 2018Order
Date: July 26, 2018Order
Date: September 28, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: October 07, 2019Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: December 12, 2019Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 07, 2019Motion
Date: May 02, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 18, 2018Request for Production
Date: October 26, 2018Response
Date: March 18, 2019Response
Date: July 23, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: June 07, 2018Affidavit in Support
Date: February 28, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 29, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: January 02, 2019Response to Motion
Date: September 25, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: June 07, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: August 29, 2018Response
Date: February 28, 2020Order Denying Motion
Date: March 04, 2020Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: July 29, 2020Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 29, 2014Order
Date: October 29, 2014Response
Date: September 08, 2014Agreed Order
Date: August 10, 2015Request for Admissions
Date: July 31, 2014Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: August 10, 2015Answer to Counterclaim
Date: May 29, 2014Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: November 11, 2015Request
Date: October 27, 2015Request for Production
Date: August 12, 2015Response
Date: December 01, 2015Agreed Order
Date: November 10, 2015Agreed Order
Date: July 22, 2015Request for Production of Documents
Date: February 11, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 09, 2015Agreed Order Granting
Date: January 22, 2016Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: November 11, 2015Request for Production of Documents
Date: April 18, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 23, 2015Privilege Log
Date: February 11, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 22, 2016Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: March 07, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 21, 2015Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: November 11, 2015Request for Production
Date: December 12, 2016Agreed Order
Date: February 26, 2016Agreed Order
Date: October 27, 2015Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: November 16, 2015Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 16, 2016Agreed Order
Date: October 27, 2015Request for Production
Date: April 18, 2016Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 22, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2017Order Granting Motion
Date: February 07, 2017Stipulation
Date: February 10, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: October 21, 2016Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: March 31, 2017Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: April 19, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 20, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: June 28, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 24, 2016Second Amended Complaint
Date: March 09, 2017Agreed Motion
Date: March 23, 2017Agreed Order
Date: March 24, 2017Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: March 31, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: June 29, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: July 14, 2016Order
Date: June 16, 2017Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 14, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 23, 2017Order
Date: August 10, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 22, 2017Order
Date: June 16, 2017Response
Date: August 09, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 23, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 23, 2017Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: March 31, 2017Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: March 31, 2017Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 03, 2017Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: April 19, 2017Amended Complaint
Date: August 21, 2017Order
Date: June 16, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 22, 2017Order Denying Motion
Date: February 21, 2018Interrogatories
Date: February 14, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 15, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: March 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 18, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 20, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 25, 2017Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 25, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: February 14, 2018Request
Date: February 20, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 14, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 13, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: March 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 14, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 22, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 22, 2017Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: March 14, 2018Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: March 21, 2018Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: March 21, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 21, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 15, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 16, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 20, 2018Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: April 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Party: Defendant iUniforms Inc Defendant Shellow, Richard |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support DECLARATION OF PLANET T UNIFORMS, INC. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRET CLAIMS |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S TRADE SECRET MISAPROPRIATION CLAIMSParty: Plaintiff PLANET T UNIFORMS, INC. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Party: Plaintiff PLANET T UNIFORMS, INC. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEPOSITION OF JON THOMAS ROGERS TAKEN ON AUGUST 27, 2018 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADESECRET CLAIMSParty: Plaintiff PLANET T UNIFORMS, INC. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEPOSITION OF SCOTT SZNITKEN, AS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE TAKEN ON SEPTEMBER 10, 2018 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRET CLAIMSParty: Plaintiff PLANET T UNIFORMS, INC. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEPOSITION OF SCOTT SZNITKEN TAKEN ON MAY 25, 2018 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITIONTO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRE CLAIMSParty: Plaintiff PLANET T UNIFORMS, INC. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEPOSITION OF ELSA RODRIGUEZ TAKEN ON FEBRUARY 18, 2020 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSTION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE ECRET CLAIMSParty: Plaintiff PLANET T UNIFORMS, INC. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEPOSITION OF MARIA TROTTO TAKEN ON OCTOBER 14, 2019 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITIO TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRT CLAIMSParty: Plaintiff PLANET T UNIFORMS, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.