Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Strike C, Llc, Strike X Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Conforti, Colby Grossman, Zarco, Roberto, against Gulfstream Park Racing Association Inc, Stronach, Belinda, Village At Gulfstream Park, Llc, represented by Kreitzer, Michael N, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Tuter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTuter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
eSummons Issuance
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 05, 2021Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: May 13, 2022Order Setting
Date: June 10, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: September 24, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: October 08, 2021Motion to Transfer
Date: October 12, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 24, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 24, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 25, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 23, 2021Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 16, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 16, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 12, 2022Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: November 01, 2021Request to Produce
Date: November 01, 2021Order
Date: December 03, 2021Order Setting
Date: January 05, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: December 16, 2021Case Management Order
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: February 07, 2022Order Setting
Date: February 09, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 17, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: March 29, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 29, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 30, 2022Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: April 21, 2022Order on Motion to Compel
Date: April 21, 2022Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: May 10, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: May 13, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: May 13, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 08, 2022Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: June 07, 2022Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: July 05, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 17, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: June 07, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 10, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 17, 2022Motion to Compel Production
Date: July 05, 2022Statement of Facts
Date: July 05, 2022Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: September 07, 2022Motion to Amend
Date: July 06, 2022Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 14, 2022Motion
Date: July 11, 2022Motion
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 21, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 21, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 13, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 14, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: August 17, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 10, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 22, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 12, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 17, 2022Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: August 16, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: August 17, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 17, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: August 17, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: August 17, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: November 10, 2022Notice of Postponement of Deposition DT
Date: August 23, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 25, 2022Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: September 01, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 26, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 01, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 19, 2023Agreed Order
Date: September 02, 2022Response to Motion
Date: October 10, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: October 24, 2022Order Granting Motion for Confidentiality
Date: October 11, 2022Joint Motion to Continue
Date: October 14, 2022Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: October 12, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 14, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: October 14, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 14, 2022Order Resetting
Date: October 17, 2022Order
Date: February 24, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: October 17, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 28, 2022Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: October 17, 2022Agreed Order
Date: October 17, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: December 07, 2022Response to Motion for Judgment
Date: October 27, 2022Motion for Rule to Show Cause
Date: October 24, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 10, 2022Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: November 14, 2022Motion to Compel Production
Date: November 28, 2022Order
Date: January 10, 2023Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 04, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: December 12, 2022Cross Notice
Date: December 06, 2022Motion for Leave
Date: January 11, 2023Order
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2023Agreed Order
Date: January 18, 2023Order Deferring
Date: December 22, 2022Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: April 24, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: January 26, 2023Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 19, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 10, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 14, 2023Order Granting Motion to Amend
Date: February 23, 2023Motion
Date: February 23, 2023Emergency Motion
Date: March 01, 2023Objection
Date: March 01, 2023Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: March 06, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: March 09, 2023Order
Date: March 06, 2023Statement of Facts
Date: March 08, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 08, 2023Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: March 13, 2023Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: March 10, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 13, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: March 24, 2023Reply
Date: March 25, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 27, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: April 03, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: April 19, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: April 19, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: April 21, 2023Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: June 26, 2023Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: January 05, 2022Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: February 09, 2022Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: February 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant Village At Gulfstream Park, LLC Defendant Gulfstream Park Racing Association Inc Defendant Stronach, Belinda |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPLEMENTAL TATEMENT OF FACTS AND OBJECTION TO INADMISSIBLE SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCEParty: Defendant Village At Gulfstream Park, LLC |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR SANCTIONSParty: Plaintiff Strike X LLC |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for In-Camera Review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.