Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Foreman, Imogene, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Ross, Linda Roberts, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Filing of Inventory/ Appraisal and How to Object
Date: April 13, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: October 30, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 27, 2021Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 17, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 30, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Accounting Report Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Initial Trust Petition Filed
Date: July 27, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 12, 2023Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Petition For:
Date: December 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2024 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
December 11, 2023 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
December 11, 2023 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Filed to: TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF WHETHER ACT OF ATTY IN FACT IS PROPER AND FOR ACCTNG |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR DETERMINATION SERVED ON SOHEILA AZIZI AND ASSOCIATES, P.C. |
|
October 23, 2023 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Beare, Margaret V |
||
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
October 23, 2023 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
August 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: reassignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.