Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Grewal Cargo Inc., Silchuk Logistics, Llc, Singh, Charanjeet, Singh, Tajinder, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against California Department Of Health Care Services, Darrisha Raquel Wheeler, Fage Usa Dairy Industry, Inc, Grewal Cargo Inc., Grewel Logistics, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Waters, Robert T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaters, Robert T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto Tort |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint was electronically filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Joaquin on February 23, 2021, at 08:52:17. The case is identified as STK-CV-UAT-2021-0001576. A Case Management Conference is scheduled for August 20, 2021, at...
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: February 23, 2021Summons issued and filed.
Date: February 23, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Singh, Charanjeet; Grewal Cargo Inc..
Date: August 13, 2021Tentative Ruling published.
Date: May 24, 2021Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: February 23, 2021Association of Counsel filed by Taylor III, Joe Edwin; Moore, Telisha L..
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Defendant Grewal Cargo Inc's Demurrer filed by Grewal Cargo Inc..
Date: April 16, 2021Summons on Cross-Complaint issued and filed.
Date: May 25, 2021Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/20/2021 08:30 AM .
Date: August 20, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Grewal Cargo Inc.; Singh, Charanjeet.
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Moore, Telisha L.; Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: January 31, 2022Tentative Ruling published.
Date: January 04, 2022Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2021 08:30 AM .
Date: November 18, 2021Tentative Ruling published.
Date: February 28, 2022Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 01/07/2022 09:00 AM .
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: February 23, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Silchuk Logistics, LLC (Doe 4).
Date: March 07, 2022Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel held on 03/01/2022 09:00 AM .
Date: March 01, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Moore, Telisha L.; Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: March 07, 2022Tentative Ruling published.
Date: March 17, 2022Defendant Darrisha Wheeler's Answer to Cross Complaint filed by Wheeler, Darrisha R.
Date: March 15, 2022Amendment to Complaint filed by Taylor III, Joe Edwin; Moore, Telisha L..
Date: October 22, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: August 10, 2021Amendment to Complaint as to DOE 1 filed by Moore, Telisha L..
Date: April 26, 2021Proof of service filed by Moore, Telisha L..
Date: December 16, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Moore, Telisha L.; Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: November 05, 2021Amendment to Complaint as to DOE 2 filed by Moore, Telisha L..
Date: April 26, 2021Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: February 23, 2021Summons issued and filed.
Date: February 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Taylor III, Joe Edwin.
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Defendant Grewal Cargo Inc's Demurrer filed by Grewal Cargo Inc..
Date: April 16, 2021Amendment to Complaint as to DOE 2 filed by Moore, Telisha L..
Date: April 26, 2021Amendment to Complaint as to DOE 1 filed by Moore, Telisha L..
Date: April 26, 2021Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: February 23, 2021Amended Summons on Cross-Complaint issued and filed.
Date: November 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 17, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | 2021-1576 Taylor Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint 3/18/2022 Cross-Defendant Taylor demurrers to the First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Complainant Grewal. Having read the moving pap... | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Darrisha R Wheeler.
Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Wheeler, Darrisha R. Request to Waive Court Fees Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED Defendant Darrisha Wheeler's Answer to Cross Complaint filed by Wheeler, Darrisha R. First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Silchuk Logistics, LLC (Doe 4). Case Management Statement Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Moore, Telisha L.; Taylor III, Joe Edwin. Case Management Statement Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Singh, Charanjeet; Grewal Cargo Inc.; Singh, Tajinder. Case Management Statement Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
OPPOSITION FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Supprt of Cross-Complainants Grewal Cargo Inc., Charanjeet Singh, and Tajinder Singh Named as Doe 3's Opposition To Cross-Defendant Joe Edwin Taylor's Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Grewal Cargo Inc.; Singh, Charanjeet. Opposition Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Cross-Complainants Grewal Cargo Inc., Charanjeet Singh, and Tajinder Singh Named as Doe 3's Opposition To Cross-Defendant Joe Edwin Taylor's Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Grewal Cargo Inc.; Singh, Charanjeet. Request for Judicial Notice Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.