Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Andrew Ho, Ho, Andrew, V5 System, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Seth W. Weiner, Weiner, Seth W., against Bedwan, Mazin, Mazin Bedwan, Steven Yung, V5 System, Inc., Yung, Steven, (total of 5) See All represented by Andrew G. Watters, Watters, Andrew G., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with Eumi K. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEumi K. Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Other Breach Of Contract/Warr...) |
Time To Trial152 days |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-05-01T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Denied
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Taken Under Submission
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Taken Under Submission
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by E-Mail or Electronic Transmision of Andrew Ho's Reply Memorandum of Points and A
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Andrew Ho's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer to V5 Systems, Inc.'s
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Andrew Ho's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Sanctions Against V5
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Andrew Ho's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Monetary, Issue and/
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Andrew Ho
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service Electronic Service Filed
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for V5 System, Inc.
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for V5 System, Inc.
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service Jury Fee Deposit and Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint - Overruled
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Andrew Ho Filed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Declaration of A. Ho Filed
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service Undertaking Filed
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Undertaking Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Amended Order Right to Attach Filed
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service Ex-Parte Application Filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Appl to set aside the Right to attach Filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service By Electronic Mail Filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Opposition to VS Systems, Inc. Application to Set Aside the Right to Attach Order Filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2020-11-01T00:00:00Order Granting Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment Filed
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Application For Right to attach order Filed
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ex-parte Application for Right to Attach Order Filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint Filed by V5 System, Inc., Steven Yung, Mazin Bedwan
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Ho
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL - JUDGMENT Filed by: Clerk As to: V5 System, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Seth W. Wiener Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Motion for Order Motion for OSC re Contempt Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Seth W. Wiener in support of Motion to Compel Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Order re: Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Regarding Release of Undertaking Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Updated -- Stipulation and Order Regarding Release of Undertaking: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Issued by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Judgment Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order Signed and Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Proposed Order: Result: Granted As To Parties: removed
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff) Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Vacated Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 15, 2021Other - (*Judge's Memo to Clerk - PTSC: Case settled) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))
Date: December 17, 2021Reply Reply to Order to Show Cause Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: November 15, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: V5 System, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 27, 2021Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Andrew Ho
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 01, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Andrew Ho (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 04/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Andrew Ho
Date: March 09, 2021Proof of Service on Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: February 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: February 17, 2021Proposed Order
Date: February 17, 2021Motion for Sanctions Hearing Confirmed for 04/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 17, 2021Motion for Sanctions Filed for Plaintiff
Date: February 17, 2021First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for V5 System, Inc.
Date: January 27, 2021Proof of Service Electronic Service Filed
Date: January 27, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed for V5 System, Inc.
Date: January 27, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 11/08/2021 09:30 AM D- 20
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Jury Fee Deposit and Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 12, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 06, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 01/04/2022 09:30 AM D- 20
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial 01/10/2022 08:30 AM D- 20
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 06, 2021Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 12/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 303
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint - Overruled
Date: January 06, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: December 17, 2020Order Granting Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment Filed
Date: October 08, 2020Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Informal Discovery Conference Declaration of A. Ho Filed
Date: December 09, 2020TR - Demurrer to Complaint - Overruled
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Opposition to Ex-parte Application (Reply) Filed by Andrew Ho
Date: November 02, 2020Opposition to VS Systems, Inc. Application to Set Aside the Right to Attach Order Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Proposed Order
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Ex-parte Application for Right to Attach Order Filed
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service By Electronic Mail Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Proposed Order Application|
Date: October 01, 2020Writ of Attachment Issued To Alameda
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2020-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: October 01, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Service Undertaking Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management Statement of Andrew Ho Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: January 06, 2021Amended Order Right to Attach Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Case Management Conf Continuance 12/17/2020 09:30 AM D- 20
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Appl to set aside the Right to attach Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Undertaking Filed for Plaintiff
Date: November 12, 2020Declaration in Support Application|
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service Ex-Parte Application Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Declaration in Support Application|
Date: October 01, 2020Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proposed Order
Date: November 02, 2020Notes: IDC 12/17/20 11 AM
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: October 01, 2020Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: November 02, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Service on Motion
Date: September 23, 2020Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Application for Right to Attach Order
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: September 23, 2020Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 01/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Declaration in Support Andrew G. Watters
Date: September 23, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 23, 2020Demurrer to Complaint Filed by V5 System, Inc., Steven Yung, Mazin Bedwan
Date: September 23, 2020Initial Case Management Conference 01/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: August 13, 2020Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 13, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Ho
Date: August 07, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 28, 2021Second Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Proof of Service by Mail Answer via Electronic Mail Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Motion for Sanctions - Motion Rescheduled
Date: April 30, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 01, 2021Case Management Statement of Andrew Ho Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: May 01, 2021Tentative Case Management Order
Date: May 05, 2021Case Management Statement of Andrew Ho Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Taken Under Submission
Date: April 30, 2021Motion for Sanctions Hearing Confirmed for 04/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 20
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed for Plaintiff
Date: March 09, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: March 09, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: March 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 09, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 09, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: March 09, 2021Opposition to Ex-parte Application Filed by Andrew Ho
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Taken Under Submission
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Mazin Bedwan (Defendant) | ||
August 30, 2023 | Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Andrew G. Watters (Attorney) | ||
August 23, 2023 | Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by V5 System, Inc. (Defendant) | ||
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Andrew G. Watters (Attorney) scheduled for 08/30/2023 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/24/2023 Event |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order re: Court Order Dismissing action. Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Mazin Bedwan (Defendant) scheduled for 08/30/2023 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/24/2023 Event |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Court Order Dismissing action.) Minute Order |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
On the Amended on 06/09/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by V5 System, Inc. (Defendant) scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/24/2023 Event |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees by: Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.