Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kwok, Jennifer Shuk-Han, Kwong, Jeanne, Ouyang, Feng, Wong, Gary, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Bernhard, Daniel Thornton, Foster, Phil, Robbins, B. Douglas, Tour-Sarkissian, Paul, Zusman, Edward S, (total of 5) See All against Kwok, Jennifer Shuk-Han, Kwong, Jeanne, Ouyang, Feng, Stan Kwong Irrevocable Trust Ii, Wong, Gary, (total of 5) See All represented by Foster, Phil, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management365 days |
Filing DateMay 12, 2010 |
CategoryOther Probate (Petition By Beneficiary To Recover Benefits Of Insurance Proceeds From Trustee On Claims Of Breach Of Fiduciary Duty, Negligence And Fraud) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2919 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
|
This complaint is a supplement to a petition filed by Jennifer Shuk-Han Kwok in the Superior Court of the State of California, City and County of San Francisco. The case number is PES-10-293505. Jennifer Shuk-Han Kwok is the petitioner and is seeking...
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE AMENDED APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: February 26, 2019ORDER SETTING TRIAL IN THE DEPARTMENT OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE AND NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 27, 2017NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: August 20, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62368152) FILED BY APPELLANT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: August 21, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62196932) FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: July 02, 2018CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 20, 2018CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: May 13, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 59990680) FILED BY ATTORNEY HINSHAW, CAROLINE K
Date: December 22, 2016CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $1,033.00
Date: February 26, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59808915) FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: November 08, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61983216) FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: May 02, 2018REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59808915) FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: November 08, 2016NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: June 16, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60330637) FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: March 13, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: January 27, 2012MINUTES FOR MAY-16-2014 2:30 PM
Date: May 16, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: December 30, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61963524) FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: April 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: February 01, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL [RICHARD M. BRYAN, ESQ.] FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE
Date: February 06, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL [CARL LIPPENBERGER, ESQ.] FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE
Date: February 06, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL [EDWARD S. ZUSMAN, ESQ.] FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE
Date: February 06, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61818854) FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: March 19, 2018ORDER VACATING REMOVAL OF TRUSTEE DATED OCTOBER 2011
Date: February 16, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE
Date: June 04, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: May 12, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: June 03, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: June 03, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: June 03, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: May 20, 2010CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY OBJECTOR OUYANG, FENG
Date: April 19, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: June 15, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-12-2011 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 613
Date: May 12, 2011CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: April 28, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: September 27, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: October 14, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: October 13, 2011MINUTES FOR OCT-07-2011 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 613
Date: October 07, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: June 11, 2010PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE
Date: July 08, 2010STATUS HEARING REPORT BY CROSS RESPONDENT/PETITIONER FENG OUYANG FILED BY OBJECTOR OUYANG, FENG
Date: September 21, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: August 23, 2010PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER WONG, GARY
Date: August 20, 2010MINUTES FOR OCT-12-2011 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 613
Date: October 12, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT OUYANG, FENG
Date: August 03, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: July 20, 2010AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER WONG, GARY
Date: August 23, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: August 23, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER WONG, GARY
Date: August 06, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER OUYANG, FENG
Date: July 16, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: August 06, 2010PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER WONG, GARY
Date: August 19, 2010PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: June 15, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL [DANIEL BERNHARD, ESQ.] FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE
Date: February 06, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KWONG, JEANNE
Date: February 17, 2012MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 59808915) FILED BY RESPONDENT WONG, GARY
Date: November 08, 2016CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE
Date: April 25, 2014ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE
Date: May 22, 2018ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL
Date: May 22, 2018REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A155103 DIV 4
Date: July 20, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY PETITIONER KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN
Date: July 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A155103 DIV 4 | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 5 VOLS CT, RTS ATTACHED TO AMENDED DESIGNATION [APPEAL FILED 7/19/18, A155103 DIV 4] | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 63092010) BY APPELLANT KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 63043377) BY RESPONDENT KWONG, JEANNE | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE AMENDED APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT, ESTIMATED COST $1,966.00 [$2,066.00, LESS $100.00] | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $1,033.00 | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL *AMENDED* [RT ATTACHED](TRANSACTION ID # 62382952) FILED BY APPELLANT KWOK, JENNIFER SHUK-HAN | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62368152) FILED BY APPELLANT KWONG, JEANNE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.