Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barraentes, Frances Cardenas filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Order Appointing Guardian Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: July 08, 2021Initial Petition for Guardianship
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Declaration Under UCCJEA Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: July 08, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Consent of Prop Guar/Nomination of Guardian/Consent to Appt
Date: July 08, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: December 09, 2021Letters Issued - Person
Date: October 26, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: August 17, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: April 27, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: August 03, 2022Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: October 26, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 08, 2021Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Purchased 3 - LETTERS, MIN ORDR AND ORDER 10/26/21 |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed OF PRISCILLA GONZALEZ |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Filed NO BOND REQ |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Person | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed | |
October 26, 2022 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Daniel, Jennifer |
||
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Signed | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Temporary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.