Related Content
in San Bernardino County
Ruling
2024CUPT025170 IN THE MATTER OF KAORI ARIEL KNUCKLES
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA
COUNTY OF VENTURA
Tentative Ruling
2024CUPT025170: IN THE MATTER OF KAORI ARIEL KNUCKLES
07/17/2024 in Department 21
OSC - Name Change
The morning calendar in courtroom 21 will normally begin between 8:30 and 8:45 a.m. Please
arrive at the courtroom no later than 8:30 a.m. The door will be opened before the calendar is
called.
The Court allows appearances by CourtCall but is not equipped for Zoom. If appearing by
CourtCall, call in no later than 8:15 a.m. If you intend to appear by CourtCall, you must make
arrangements with CourtCall by 4:00 p.m. the day before your scheduled hearing. Requests for
approval of a CourtCall appearance made on the morning of the hearing will not be granted. No
exceptions will be made.
With respect to the tentative ruling below, no notice of intent to appear is required. If you wish to
submit on the tentative ruling you can fax notice to Judge Riley's secretary, Ms. Sedillos at
805-289-8705, stating that you submit on the tentative. You may also email the Court at:
Courtroom21@ventura.courts.ca.gov with all counsel copied on the email. Do not call in lieu of
sending a fax or email. If you submit on the tentative without appearing and the opposing party
appears, the hearing will be conducted in your absence. If you are the moving party and do not
communicate to the Court that you submit on the tentative or you do not appear at the hearing,
the Court may deny your motion irrespective of the tentative.
Unless stated otherwise at the hearing, if a formal order is not signed at the hearing, the
prevailing party shall prepare a proposed order and comply with CRC 3.1312 subdivisions (a),
(b), (d) and (e). The signed order shall be served on all parties and a proof of service filed with
the court. A "notice of ruling" in lieu of this procedure is not authorized.
Tentative Ruling
The Court GRANTS Petitioner’s Petition to change the name of her minor daughter.
Analysis
The Petition appears properly filled out and otherwise sufficient.
On July 8, 2024, Petitioner filed proof of publication of the Court’s Order to Show Cause in the
Thousand Oaks Acorn, as required by Code of Civil Procedure §1277(a)(2)(B) and the Court's
May 28, 2024 OSC.
Family Code §8617 provides, in pertinent part, as follows:
2024CUPT025170: IN THE MATTER OF KAORI ARIEL KNUCKLES
“(a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), the existing parent or parents of an adopted child are,
from the time of the adoption, relieved of all parental duties towards, and all responsibility for,
the adopted child, and have no right over the child.
In the absence of any evidence indicating that both Kaori’s biological parents and Petitioner
waived the termination of the biological parents rights/obligations upon adoption pursuant to
§8617(b), the Court finds that Petitioner was not required to serve Kaori’s biological parents
with a copy of the Order to Show Cause, and so grants the petition.
Ruling
2024CUPP019108 LEE ESTELLE GARRISON vs MACERICH MANAGEMENT, CO., et al.
Jul 19, 2024 |
Ronda J. McKaig
|
Motion for Protective Order |
2024CUPP019108
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA
COUNTY OF VENTURA
Tentative Ruling
2024CUPP019108: LEE ESTELLE GARRISON vs MACERICH MANAGEMENT, CO.,
et al.
07/19/2024 in Department 41
Motion for by Non-Party
Tentative Rulings:
The Court GRANTS Madeline Rana’s application to appear Pro Hac Vice.
The Court GRANTS Non-party Apple Inc.’s motion for a protective order. The protective order
shall be modified in a way that is limited to production of records by Apple. The Court makes
the following changes to Apple’s proposed protective order:
• Item 2 – Definitions.
o Subparagraph (a), shall be modified to read:
“Discovery Material” means all items or information, regardless of the medium or manner
generated, stored, or maintained (including, among other things, testimony, transcripts, or
tangible things) that are produced, disclosed, or generated by Apple, Inc., in this case.
o Subparagraph (d), shall be modified to read:
“Producing Party” means Apple, Inc.
• Item 3 – Computation of Time
o This item shall be modified to read:
The computation of any period of time prescribed or allowed by this Order shall be governed by
the provisions for computing time set forth in the California Code of Civil Procedure.
• Item 4 – Scope
o Subparagraph (a), shall be modified to read:
The protections conferred by this Order cover not only Discovery Material governed by this
Order as addressed herein, but also any information copied or extracted therefrom, as well as all
copies, excerpts, summaries, or compilations thereof that might reveal Protected Material.
• Item 8 – Discovery Materials Designated as “Confidential”
o Subparagraph (b)(ii), shall be modified to read:
(ii) The Receiving Party’s in-house counsel, such counsel’s immediate paralegals and staff, and
any copying or clerical litigation support services working at the direction of such counsel,
paralegals, and staff;
o Subparagraph (b)(x), shall be added and read:
(x) The Receiving Party(ies).
• Item 16 – Discovery from Experts or Consultants
Item 16 shall be deleted. The proposed language goes beyond the scope of Apple’s motion.
2024CUPP019108: LEE ESTELLE GARRISON vs MACERICH MANAGEMENT, CO.,
et al.
The protective order contains a mechanism by which designations can be challenged and the
parties should follow those procedures going forward. The Court declines to rule on any
proposed designations at this time.
A revised protective order is to be submitted forthwith. Apple to give notice.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: VICTORIA YEGIAZARYAN
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01517
Case Number:
24STCP01517
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: JUNHAN CHO, ET AL.
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01481
Case Number:
24STCP01481
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
2024CUPT025317 IN THE MATTER OF: XOCHITL LIZBETH CASTRO FELIX
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA
COUNTY OF VENTURA
Tentative Ruling
2024CUPT025317: IN THE MATTER OF: XOCHITL LIZBETH CASTRO FELIX
07/19/2024 in Department 21
OSC - Name Change
The morning calendar in courtroom 21 will normally begin between 8:30 and 8:45 a.m. Please
arrive at the courtroom no later than 8:30 a.m. The door will be opened before the calendar is
called.
The Court allows appearances by CourtCall but is not equipped for Zoom. If appearing by
CourtCall, call in no later than 8:15 a.m. If you intend to appear by CourtCall, you must make
arrangements with CourtCall by 4:00 p.m. the day before your scheduled hearing. Requests for
approval of a CourtCall appearance made on the morning of the hearing will not be granted. No
exceptions will be made.
With respect to the tentative ruling below, no notice of intent to appear is required. If you wish to
submit on the tentative ruling you can fax notice to Judge Riley's secretary, Ms. Sedillos at
805-289-8705, stating that you submit on the tentative. You may also email the Court at:
Courtroom21@ventura.courts.ca.gov with all counsel copied on the email. Do not call in lieu of
sending a fax or email. If you submit on the tentative without appearing and the opposing party
appears, the hearing will be conducted in your absence. If you are the moving party and do not
communicate to the Court that you submit on the tentative or you do not appear at the hearing,
the Court may deny your motion irrespective of the tentative.
Unless stated otherwise at the hearing, if a formal order is not signed at the hearing, the
prevailing party shall prepare a proposed order and comply with CRC 3.1312 subdivisions (a),
(b), (d) and (e). The signed order shall be served on all parties and a proof of service filed with
the court. A "notice of ruling" in lieu of this procedure is not authorized.
Tentative Ruling
The Court GRANTS the Petition for Change of Name.
The Court finds all statutory requirements have been met and proceeds to confirm the spelling of
the proposed name with Petitioner.
A proof of publication was filed on June 27, 2024
Once the Court grants the Petition and signs the Decree Changing Name, a certified copy will
need to be obtained from the Records Department, Room 218. A certified copy of the Decree
will be needed to change the name on legal documents, including birth certificates, social
security cards, and other government-issued identification such as passports or driver’s licenses.
Ruling
VARANI VS VARANI
Jul 18, 2024 |
FL-23-000439
FL-23-000439 – VARANI VS VARANI
Continued Hearing on Petitioner’s Request for Order re Attorney’s Fees, etc.—HEARING REQUIRED.
Counsel shall meet and confer on all issues in good faith, and shall exchange any and all documents to be used for proof of any material fact other than impeachment. (Cal. Rules of Ct., rule 5.98.)
Ruling
City of Anderson vs. Krumins, et al.
Jul 19, 2024 |
23CV-0203032
CITY OF ANDERSON VS. KRUMINS, ET AL.
Case Number: 23CV-0203032
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of the receivership and clean up of the property. On July
2, 2024, the Court granted the Receiver’s Ex Parte Application for Order to Respondents to Vacate the
Receivership Property. The Ninth Report of the Receiver was filed on July 10, 2024. An appearance by all
parties is necessary on today’s calendar to discuss the status of the receivership.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: CAMI EKSTROM
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01487
Case Number:
24STCP01487
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.