Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Doe, John Vnr, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Manly, Stewart & Finaldi, against Brown, Eric Lynn, Does 1-100, Victor Valley Union High School District, represented by Dolen Tucker Tierney & Abraham, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey R Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by John VNR Doe, an individual, against Victor Valley Union High School District, Eric Lynn Brown, and Does 1 through 100. The complaint alleges multiple causes of action, including negligence, negligent supervision, negligent...
Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 02, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 28, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: February 28, 2022Motion re:
Date: September 18, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 03, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: June 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Filing Fee Paid by
Date: June 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 06, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: April 06, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 27, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 03, 2021Answer Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 08, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 20, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 28, 2022Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 14, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 17, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 20, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: May 25, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 18, 2024Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration re:
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 15, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 03, 2022Reply Filed Electronically
Date: October 23, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: September 13, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: February 21, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Objection Filed
Date: May 17, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 03, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 25, 2022Notice Filed
Date: March 18, 2024Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service
Date: May 05, 2022Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: January 18, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
March 25, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice OF NON-OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL CIVIL |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed | |
February 21, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed ISO Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Plaintiff John VNR Doe on complaint filed 01/07/22 |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60 paid on 01/26/24 for motion |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed | |
October 30, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.