Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Rancho Del Chino, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Vivoli Saccuzzo, Llp, against A&B Chino Hotels, Llc, A&B Hotel Management Investment, Inc., Does 2 To 20, Js Hotel Development, Inc., Maa Byu Hospitality, Llc, (total of 8) See All represented by Law Offices Of Mark B. Plummer, Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph T Ortiz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management341 days |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil Contracts |
|
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions148 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: July 13, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 11, 2023Order signed and filed.
Date: August 10, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 27, 2024Notice
Date: July 14, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Answer Filed
Date: July 28, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: July 20, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 05, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 03, 2023Reply Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: March 29, 2024Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: January 06, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: May 26, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: October 09, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 05, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: September 14, 2020Answer Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Notice
Date: October 15, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: October 14, 2020Brief Filed
Date: August 11, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: November 05, 2019Answer Filed
Date: February 22, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 23, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 04, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: March 17, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: August 20, 2022Declaration re:
Date: February 14, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 16, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 05, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Motion re:
Date: July 13, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 29, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 08, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: May 08, 2023Reply To:
Date: May 12, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 05, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Motion re:
Date: March 25, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Notice Filed
Date: May 19, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 19, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 19, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: July 27, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 13, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: March 17, 2023Trial Brief Filed Electronically
Date: April 03, 2024Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: March 25, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: May 08, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 02, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 28, 2024Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 28, 2024Declaration re:
Date: May 05, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: March 05, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 12, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 05, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: October 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 09, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: April 07, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 08, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 04, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief Filed Electronically DEFENDANTS TRIAL BRIEF |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically DEFENDANTS'PPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I TO EXCLUDE TENDER; DECLARATION OF MARK B. PLUMMER |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 - TO ANY EVIDENCE OF COMMON AREA EXPENSES AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENCE CODE 402 HEARING; DECLARATION OF MARK B. PLUMMER; ORDER |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 - TO EXCLUDE PRE- LITIGATION SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS; DECLARATION OF MARK B. PLUMMER; ORDER |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: TO PRELCUDE SETLEMENT DISCUSSIONS |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed DISMISSAL AS TO A&B HOTEL MANAGEMENT INVEST. AND BHARAT "BRET" MARU |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of entry of order re defendants' demurrer to third amended complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.