Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Juarez Alvarez, Yolanda, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Bessemer Trust Company, N.A., City Of Fontana, Does 1 Through 100, Does 5 Through 100, Inclusive, Hunt Enterprises, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Alderman And Hilgers, Llp, Schumann Arevalo Llp, Schumann Rosenberg & Arevalo Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2019 |
CategoryComplaint For Damages Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions192 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer Filed
Date: January 27, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 26, 2019Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: July 23, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: October 23, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: July 21, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: July 16, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 17, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 12, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: July 05, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: November 25, 2019Reply Filed
Date: January 13, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: July 05, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 31, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: June 13, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: May 31, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 20, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 31, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 23, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 05, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 05, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: January 14, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 08, 2020Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 10, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 27, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: April 09, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: February 22, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 23, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 09, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 23, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 11, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 10, 2023Reply Filed
Date: May 03, 2022Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 02, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: July 14, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 08, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: July 14, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 15, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: November 02, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 30, 2023Reply Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: May 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 09, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 09, 2023Reply Filed
Date: July 06, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: May 12, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication
Date: March 02, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 08, 2022Points and Authorities Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 09, 2023Declaration re:
Date: January 17, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Declaration re:
Date: August 17, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 05, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 10, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 03, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 27, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: January 25, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 14, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 15, 2022Objection Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 09, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: April 05, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 26, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: October 03, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Reply Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 23, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: May 12, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 04, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: December 23, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 30, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 21, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 21, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 04, 2019Reply Filed
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 05, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 28, 2020Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 17, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 31, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Points and Authorities Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Answer Filed
Date: July 05, 2019Answer Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Motion Filed
Date: December 06, 2019Motion Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Motion Filed
Date: December 06, 2019Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Answer Filed
Date: January 03, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 17, 2020Reply Filed
Date: June 25, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 27, 2020Motion re:
Date: September 23, 2021Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: September 29, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Objection Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 08, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication
Date: March 02, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: May 08, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint
Date: March 24, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 06, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Motion re:
Date: September 23, 2021Reply Filed
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
June 20, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
November 07, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
November 06, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply Filed Electronically | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Filed to: PLA'S SUPPLEMENTAL SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED/UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed TO SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MSJ |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Evidentiary Objections Filed | |
November 02, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed to continue trial and all trial related dates and deadlines |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.