Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Hyle, John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rizio Lipinsky Law Firm Pc, Toor Law, Apc, against Aguilar, Elia M, Rodriguez, Arianna Athena, Rodriguez, Arianne Athena, Rodriguez, David J, represented by Keith L Shoji & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A Sachs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 21, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 02, 2019Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief Filed
Date: October 28, 2019Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief Filed
Date: October 28, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 09, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 09, 2022Exhibits List Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 09, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 09, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 09, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 09, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: October 17, 2022Answer Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: December 28, 2023Filing Fee Paid by
Date: December 08, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Stipulation for Continuance of
Date: June 14, 2022Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Statement of
Date: October 24, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: January 13, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Objection Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Objection Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 21, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 06, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: December 13, 2022Stipulation Filed re:
Date: March 05, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: March 06, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 21, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: March 10, 2021Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 02, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 06, 2023Stipulation Filed re:
Date: January 19, 2022Verdict(s) form filed.
Date: November 14, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 02, 2023Notice Imaged
Date: May 21, 2020Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 14, 2023Notice Imaged
Date: October 01, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 09, 2022Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: October 26, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 27, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Notice
Date: October 24, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 30, 2021Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 09, 2022Stipulation Filed re:
Date: December 08, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 14, 2023Subpoenaed Records Returned Unused and Exhibit Receipt Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 05, 2024Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: February 27, 2024Amended Document Filed re:
Date: March 11, 2024Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: March 05, 2024Objection Filed
Date: February 05, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 20, 2024Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: March 06, 2024Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: February 23, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 14, 2024Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: March 04, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 22, 2024Motion to Tax Costs
Date: January 16, 2024Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: January 23, 2024Motion re:
Date: January 22, 2024Notice Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: September 27, 2023Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: November 14, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 09, 2022Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 21, 2023Statement of
Date: October 24, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: October 25, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: January 08, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
March 27, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Comment: This appeal is 8.124 and no oral proceedings, Appeal is complete. |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed TO PLA MOTION TO TAX DEF'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; MEMO OF P & A; DEC OF TRACY W. GOLDBERG |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed re: Corrected notice of ruling on Plaintiff John Hyle's motion for new trial |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Audio upload completed Uploaded audio clips / certificate of electronic recording / minute order for 2-26-24 hearing to Escribers. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.