Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Torres, Christopher, Torres, Melissa, filed a(n) Product Liability Unlimited case represented by Metzger Law Group, against Barnes Group Inc., As Successor By Acquisition Of Kar Products, Inc., A, Barnes Group Inc. As Successor By Acquisition Of Kar Products,Llc, B C Stocking Distributing, A California Corporation, B'Laster Llc, Chevron Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, (total of 24) See All represented by Alston & Bird Llp, Berkes Crane Santana & Spangler Llp, Everett Dorey Llp, Glynn & Finley, Llp, Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David E Driscoll presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E Driscoll Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2019 |
CategoryProduct Liability Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2024 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions461 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 17, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 11, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 26, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 26, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Notice Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Reply Filed
Date: May 24, 2019Answer Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 21, 2019Reply Filed
Date: October 02, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 28, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 08, 2019Motion Filed
Date: May 28, 2019Declaration re:
Date: December 29, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 05, 2019Answer Filed
Date: June 13, 2019At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: November 18, 2019At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 27, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 17, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: January 03, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 01, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: June 09, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 06, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 04, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 26, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 26, 2019Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: December 29, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 28, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 21, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 04, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: December 21, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Motion re:
Date: September 08, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 29, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 24, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Application for Order Filed re:
Date: July 21, 2020Declaration re:
Date: December 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Conversion event
Date: June 08, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 27, 2020Declaration re:
Date: December 29, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 26, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 19, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Motion Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 01, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 02, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: March 27, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 29, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: July 01, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 03, 2019Motion re:
Date: September 09, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 28, 2021Reply Filed
Date: May 24, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 27, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 05, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 27, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 21, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: February 26, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: May 31, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2023Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 05, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Answer Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Answer Filed
Date: May 29, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: April 08, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: March 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 27, 2023Reply Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 31, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 03, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Date: January 19, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: May 31, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 12, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 09, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 03, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 23, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 31, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: December 20, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 28, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2019Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: April 06, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 31, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 29, 2019Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: January 28, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Stipulation Filed re:
Date: August 09, 2023Proof of Service as to Clerk's Certified Mail with Costs of:
Date: August 20, 2019Proof of Service
Date: January 28, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 23, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: December 07, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 15, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: August 18, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 07, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 10, 2022Notice Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Notice Filed
Date: September 11, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: April 26, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: October 17, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: September 08, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 04, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 15, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: May 10, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Stipulation Filed re:
Date: October 12, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: February 09, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 23, 2019Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: January 28, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 23, 2019Motion Re: Joinder Filed
Date: July 28, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 06, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 11, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 16, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 29, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 23, 2019Declaration re:
Date: September 08, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Notice Filed
Date: April 12, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Motion Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Reply Filed
Date: February 15, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 13, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: November 12, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 23, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Motion re:
Date: July 26, 2023Proof of Service as to Clerk's Certified Mail with Costs of:
Date: March 26, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 17, 2023Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: March 07, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 26, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 21, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 26, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: February 26, 2019Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: March 26, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 17, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 26, 2019Reply Filed
Date: May 24, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: March 26, 2019Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 02, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: March 27, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 21, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 23, 2019Motion Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 30, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 30, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: March 29, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 24, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 23, 2019Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 23, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 01, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 03, 2019Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Motion Filed
Date: September 24, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 21, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 30, 2019Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: May 07, 2019Answer Filed
Date: May 07, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 08, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 08, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: December 27, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 27, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 28, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 09, 2019Answer Filed
Date: May 09, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: May 28, 2019Reply Filed
Date: May 24, 2019Reply Filed
Date: May 24, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: July 21, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 28, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Answer Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Reply Filed
Date: May 24, 2019Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: December 29, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Answer Filed
Date: June 03, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 21, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 10, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: August 19, 2019At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 25, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 21, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: December 06, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 27, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 29, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 05, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: September 11, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 31, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 09, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: January 28, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 17, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 03, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: February 09, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: May 30, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 19, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 04, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: February 14, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 29, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 10, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 31, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Answer Filed
Date: April 10, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 29, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 07, 2023Answer Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Motion Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Motion Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 04, 2019At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 12, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: May 12, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 16, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Order signed and Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: October 07, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 12, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: December 28, 2022Notice Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Motion Filed
Date: March 29, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: April 21, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: April 27, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 27, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 13, 2023Declaration re:
Date: June 01, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 08, 2024Notice Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Reply to Motion re:
Date: September 08, 2023Objection Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 28, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: September 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration re:
Date: June 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
May 09, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
March 12, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of David M Uchida on behalf of Safety-Kleen Systems Inc Regarding Courts OSC RE Renewal of Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel R Strecker and Christopher Palermo |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Pro Hac Vice Renewal fee payment- Daniel Strecker |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Pro Hac Vice renewal fee payment- Christopher Palermo |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 11 includes documents filed 08/03/23 ONLY |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 10 includes documents filed between 06/01/23 - 07/31/23 |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 8 includes documents filed between 5/30/23 - 06/01/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.