Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Bush, Lori, Dignity Health, A Califonia Corporation, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Michae; J Libman, against Dignity Health, A Califonia Corporation, St. Bernadine Medical Center A Business Entity Unknown, Total Professional Network, Inc, represented by Diamond & Dragojevic Llp, Thompson & Colegate, Thompson & Colgate, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2016 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a request for dismissal of a case filed by Dignity Health against St. Bernardine Medical Center. The request is made by Diane Mar Wiesmann, an attorney from Thompson & Colegate LLP, who is representing Dignity Health. The case numbe...
Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 10, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 10, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 10, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 10, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: August 10, 2016Amended Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 08, 2016Motion Filed
Date: October 07, 2016Demurrer Filed
Date: October 07, 2016Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 17, 2017Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 29, 2017Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 08, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 29, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 29, 2017Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2017Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2017Motion Filed
Date: October 23, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 23, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 25, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 25, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 25, 2017Reply Filed
Date: October 31, 2017Motion Filed
Date: January 09, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 09, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 24, 2018Reply Filed
Date: January 30, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: February 02, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 08, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: March 28, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 02, 2018Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 19, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 19, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 19, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2018Declaration re:
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 10, 2018Declaration re:
Date: March 19, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 10, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 10, 2018Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: August 10, 2018Ex Parte Filed
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 09, 2018Answer Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Declaration re:
Date: January 02, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 27, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 02, 2019Reply Filed
Date: January 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 02, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 10, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 02, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 02, 2019Reply Filed
Date: January 10, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 10, 2019Reply Filed
Date: January 10, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 16, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 06, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: February 08, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 05, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 21, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 25, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Exhibits List Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 20, 2017Reply Filed
Date: October 31, 2017Reply Filed
Date: November 28, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 20, 2017Reply Filed
Date: November 28, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: January 03, 2018Motion Filed
Date: January 03, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 21, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 09, 2018Objection Filed
Date: March 30, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 10, 2018Response Filed to:
Date: April 04, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 06, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 29, 2018Motion Filed
Date: December 12, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 24, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: October 30, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2018Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 19, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: October 31, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 24, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Ex Parte Filed
Date: October 18, 2019Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 14, 2022Objection Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 29, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Witness List Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: May 19, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 09, 2022Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of
Date: April 06, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 09, 2018Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 31, 2022Witness List Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 23, 2022Reply Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 14, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 29, 2022Motion re:
Date: July 20, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: November 30, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Objection Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 16, 2022Motion re:
Date: April 20, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Objection Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: November 15, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 06, 2022Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: April 21, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: April 25, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: January 09, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 11, 2022Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of
Date: July 06, 2022Motion re:
Date: July 06, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: July 12, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: July 14, 2022Reply Filed
Date: August 23, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: October 07, 2022Reply Filed
Date: August 23, 2022Notice Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: March 27, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 03, 2018Reply Filed
Date: June 13, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 21, 2019Trial Brief Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: February 17, 2022Trial Brief Filed
Date: March 08, 2022Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Judgment Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 22, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: June 30, 2022Motion re:
Date: July 06, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 14, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 08, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 11, 2017Motion Filed
Date: December 12, 2016Reply Filed
Date: January 18, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 11, 2017Reply Filed
Date: January 18, 2017Demurrer Filed
Date: December 12, 2016Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: February 09, 2017Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 06, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 09, 2017Answer Filed
Date: February 09, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 08, 2017Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 14, 2017Summons Issued on
Date: February 09, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 22, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 27, 2017Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 23, 2017Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: February 27, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 06, 2017Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 22, 2017Answer Filed
Date: March 29, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 29, 2017Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: March 29, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 06, 2017Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 07, 2017Reply Filed
Date: April 11, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 23, 2017Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 17, 2017Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 02, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 13, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 31, 2017Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 29, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 31, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: April 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 05, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 28, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 13, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Reply Filed
Date: October 23, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 10, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 23, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order signed and Filed Re: Judicial Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed OF JUDICIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Notice of ruling granting dignity health & Kurt weinmeister's/ motion for protective order re order to appear for examination |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $8 CC paid 08/12/23 fax fees |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed Granting Dignity Health & Kurt Weinmeister's Motion For Protective Order RE Order To Appear For Examination |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order signed and Filed Protective order RE Order to appear for examination |
|
June 22, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed for Motion for Protective Order |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed for protective order Filed by plaintiff Lori Bush on 6/9/23 |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $9.00 fax fee paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.