Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mardikian, George, Mardikian, Lillian, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Day, Montie S, against Wawanesa General Insurance Company, Wawanesa General Insurane Company, represented by Greenfield, Kenneth N, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with DuBois, Richard H. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2012 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial405 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1111 days |
Conversion Action
Date: September 16, 2015Amended Answer
Date: January 11, 2013Summons Issued / Filed
Date: October 03, 2012Conversion Action
Date: March 13, 2013Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition
Date: October 24, 2012Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 19, 2013Order received
Date: April 19, 2013Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 29, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 03, 2012Document
Date: May 14, 2013Order received
Date: May 14, 2013Notice
Date: February 25, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: February 25, 2013Conversion Action
Date: February 27, 2013Conversion Hearing
Date: March 13, 2013Declaration
Date: July 05, 2013Conversion Action
Date: July 05, 2013Motion
Date: May 14, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 14, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 08, 2013Declaration
Date: July 05, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 08, 2013Order received
Date: July 16, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 16, 2013Declaration
Date: July 22, 2013Order
Date: August 07, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 25, 2014Declaration
Date: September 23, 2013Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 23, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 03, 2013Order received
Date: October 03, 2013Declaration
Date: September 23, 2013Proof of Service
Date: August 28, 2014Order received
Date: June 25, 2014Order received
Date: September 05, 2014Proof of Service
Date: August 27, 2014Order received
Date: September 04, 2014Notice
Date: October 16, 2014Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 16, 2014Conversion Action
Date: November 13, 2014Conversion Action
Date: January 12, 2015Motion
Date: February 10, 2015Order received
Date: February 10, 2015Conversion Hearing
Date: January 12, 2015Amended
Date: February 17, 2015Document
Date: February 10, 2015Document
Date: February 03, 2015Fee Waiver Granted
Date: January 21, 2015Document
Date: January 29, 2015Motion
Date: February 10, 2015Document
Date: January 29, 2015Notice
Date: January 27, 2015Document
Date: January 21, 2015Document
Date: January 21, 2015Notice
Date: November 13, 2014Conversion Action
Date: November 06, 2014Document
Date: October 29, 2014Document
Date: October 29, 2014Order
Date: October 10, 2014Order
Date: September 22, 2014Order
Date: September 22, 2014Conversion Action
Date: September 05, 2014Conversion Action
Date: September 05, 2014Conversion Action
Date: September 05, 2014Conversion Action
Date: September 05, 2014Document
Date: September 04, 2014Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 28, 2014Declaration
Date: August 28, 2014Declaration
Date: August 28, 2014Declaration
Date: August 28, 2014Response
Date: August 28, 2014Conversion Action
Date: August 27, 2014Conversion Action
Date: August 27, 2014Document
Date: June 25, 2014Declaration
Date: June 25, 2014Declaration
Date: June 25, 2014Declaration
Date: June 25, 2014Declaration
Date: June 25, 2014Conversion Action
Date: June 25, 2014Conversion Action
Date: June 25, 2014Notice
Date: July 16, 2013Declaration
Date: July 22, 2013Declaration
Date: July 16, 2013Declaration
Date: July 16, 2013Declaration
Date: July 16, 2013Declaration
Date: July 16, 2013Declaration
Date: July 16, 2013Declaration
Date: July 16, 2013Conversion Action
Date: July 16, 2013Conversion Action
Date: July 16, 2013Conversion Action
Date: February 27, 2015Order
Date: February 19, 2015Declaration
Date: February 10, 2015Document
Date: February 10, 2015Document
Date: January 12, 2015Declaration
Date: February 10, 2015Conversion Action
Date: July 05, 2013Document
Date: July 05, 2013Notice
Date: May 14, 2013Declaration
Date: May 14, 2013Notice
Date: April 19, 2013Document
Date: April 19, 2013Declaration
Date: April 19, 2013Motion
Date: April 19, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: March 01, 2013Declaration
Date: December 26, 2012Conversion Action
Date: December 26, 2012Document
Date: January 24, 2013Conversion Action
Date: January 11, 2013Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 26, 2012Motion
Date: December 26, 2012Complaint
Date: October 03, 2012Notice
Date: October 03, 2013Declaration
Date: October 03, 2013Document
Date: October 03, 2013Document
Date: October 03, 2013Declaration
Date: September 23, 2013Declaration
Date: September 23, 2013Conversion Action
Date: September 23, 2013Conversion Action
Date: September 23, 2013Conversion Action
Date: September 23, 2013Order
Date: August 07, 2013Document
Date: March 09, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 05, 2015Declaration
Date: March 05, 2015Declaration
Date: February 27, 2015Reply Filed
Date: August 24, 2015Declaration
Date: August 24, 2015Declaration
Date: August 24, 2015Declaration
Date: August 18, 2015Conversion Action
Date: August 18, 2015Conversion Action
Date: August 18, 2015Opposition
Date: August 18, 2015Declaration
Date: July 31, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 31, 2015Document
Date: July 31, 2015Motion
Date: July 31, 2015Order
Date: July 27, 2015Declaration
Date: July 27, 2015Conversion Action
Date: June 30, 2015Notice
Date: June 23, 2015Declaration
Date: May 28, 2015Reply Filed
Date: June 04, 2015Opposition
Date: May 28, 2015Document
Date: May 11, 2015Declaration
Date: May 01, 2015Motion
Date: May 01, 2015Declaration
Date: May 01, 2015Notice
Date: April 22, 2015Order
Date: April 01, 2015Document
Date: March 25, 2015Document
Date: October 19, 2015Document
Date: October 19, 2015Document
Date: October 19, 2015Document
Date: October 19, 2015Document
Date: October 19, 2015Document
Date: October 19, 2015Document
Date: October 19, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: COUNSEL ANNOUNCE READY, WITH 10 DAY ESTIMATE |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: 16 JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. Judge: DuBois, Richard H. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF OR ARGUMENTS OF MISREPRESENTATION OR CONCEALMENT IN ADDING...MIL#3, Document FILED: MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF OR ARGUMENTS OF MISREPRESENTATION OR CONCEALMENT IN ADDING...MIL#3, FILED. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTIONS TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ANY PAYMENTS FROM OTHER INSURANCE AND/OR THIRD PARTIES MIL#2, FILED Document FILED: MOTIONS TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ANY PAYMENTS FROM OTHER INSURANCE AND/OR THIRD PARTIES MIL#2, FILED. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO BIFURCATE ATTY FEES AND COSTS FOR POST VERDICT DETERMINATION BY COURT (BRANDT..., FILED. Document FILED: MOTION TO BIFURCATE ATTY FEES AND COSTS FOR POST VERDICT DETERMINATION BY COURT (BRANDT..., FILED. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF CHARLES ALLEN (VIA DEPOSITION) MIL#1, FILED. Document FILED: MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF CHARLES ALLEN (VIA DEPOSITION) MIL#1, FILED. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JURY VOIR DIRE, FILED. Document FILED: PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JURY VOIR DIRE, FILED. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED STATEMENT TO THE JURY, FILED. Document FILED: PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED STATEMENT TO THE JURY, FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.